EP3438254 - POLYPEPTIDE HAVING ENDONUCLEASE ACTIVITY AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 3-18, Nakanoshima 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIYAMA Tozo c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/06] | Application number, filing date | 17774955.3 | 27.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017JP12419 | Priority number, date | JP20160069627 | 30.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016069627 | [2019/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017170418 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3438254 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/16, C12N1/16, C12N15/09, C12P21/02, C12N15/52 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
C12N1/16 (EP,US);
C12N15/09 (EP,US);
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12N15/815 (US);
C12P21/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/06] | C12N9/16, C12N1/16, C12N15/09, C12P21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Title | German: | POLYPEPTID MIT ENDONUKLEASEAKTIVITÄT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/06] | English: | POLYPEPTIDE HAVING ENDONUCLEASE ACTIVITY AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SAME | [2019/06] | French: | POLYPEPTIDE PRÉSENTANT UNE ACTIVITÉ ENDONUCLÉASE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2018 | Translation filed | 12.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 02.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0582244 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]US6365355 (MCCUTCHEN-MALONEY SANDRA L [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 3; claim 8; sequence 5 *; | [X]WO2011015327 (LECTA GMBH C [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * figure 1; sequence 3 *; | [X] - "SubName: Full=DNA/RNA non-specific endonuclease {ECO:0000313|EMBL:SUQ37428.1}; SubName: Full=Nuclease {ECO:0000313|EMBL:CEK27969.1}; EC=3.1.30.2 {ECO:0000313|EMBL:CEK27969.1, ECO:0000313|EMBL:SUQ37428.1};", UniProt, (20150304), Database accession no. A0A0A8VJ06, URL: EBI, XP002793852 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * | International search | [XYA]JPS63500142 (A/S ALFRED BENZON) [X] 1, 2, 5-7 * , claims; examples & US 5173418 A claims; examples & WO 1986/006743 A1 & EP 229866 A1 & CN 86104387 A * [Y] 1-3, 5-7 [A] 4; | [A]JPH06296482 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH) [A] 1-7 * , claims & US 5705616 A claims & EP 582244 A2 & KR 10-0140973 B *; | [A]JP2010512160 (Biorexis Pharmaceutical Corp.) [A] 1-7 * , paragraph [0184] & US 2011/0086768 A1 paragraph [0214] & WO 2008/072075 A2 & EP 2114999 A2 & KR 10-2009-0098880 A & CN 101622274 A *; | [XA]WO2014131113 (UNIV LAVAL [CA]) [X] 1-3, 5-7 * , examples & US 2016/0053242 A1 & CA 2908079 A * [A] 4; | [PXYA]CN105985968 (GPROAN BIOTECHNOLOGY (SUZHOU) CO LTD) [PX] 1, 2, 5-7 * , examples (Family: none) * [PY] 1-3, 5-7 [PA] 4 | [XYA] - BIEDERMANN, K. et al., "Purification and characterization of a Serratia marcescens nuclease produced by Escherichia coli", Carlsberg Research Communications, (19890000), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 17 - 27, XP 001317025 [X] 1, 2, 5-7 * , particularly, page 18 * [Y] 1-3, 5-7 [A] 4 | [XYA] - BIEDERMANN, K. et al., "Fermentation studies of the secretion of Serratia marcescens nuclease by Escherichia coli", Applied and Environmental Microbiology, (19900000), vol. 56, no. 6, pages 1833 - 1838, XP 002561838 [X] 1, 2, 5-7 * , particularly, page 1833, right column * [Y] 1-3, 5-7 [A] 4 | [X] - UniProtKB, (20160217), Database accession no. A0A0T9KWK0, URL: UniProt, XP055545547 [X] 1-7 | [YA] - YURUGI-KOBAYASHI, T. et al., "Comparison of functional non-glycosylated GPCRs expression in Pichia pastoris", Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, (20090000), vol. 380, no. 2, pages 271 - 276, XP 026005747 [Y] 1-3, 5-7 * , particularly, pages 272 to 273 * [A] 4 | [YA] - LEE, S.-B. et al., "Expression of the non- glycosylated kringle domain of tissue type plasminogen activator in Pichia and its anti- endothelial cell activity", Protein Expression and Purification, (20060000), vol. 50, no. 1, pages 1 - 8, XP 024908852 [Y] 1-3, 5-7 * , particularly, pages 4 to 5 * [A] 4 | [YA] - HOSHIDA, H. et al., "N-glycosylation deficiency enhanced heterologous production of a Bacillus licheniformis thermostable a-amylase in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", Applied Microbiology and Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 97, no. 12, pages 5473 - 5482, XP 035328902 [Y] 1-3, 5-7 * , particularly, pages 5474 to 5475, page 5479, Fig.5 * [A] 4 |