EP3438714 - OPTICALLY ANISOTROPIC LAYER AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, OPTICALLY ANISOTROPIC LAMINATE AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, OPTICALLY ANISOTROPIC TRANSFER BODY, POLARIZATION PLATE, AND IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Manabu c/o ZEON CORPORATION 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Vos, Derk Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/06] | Vos, Derk Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17774992.6 | 27.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017JP12486 | Priority number, date | JP20160068385 | 30.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016068385 | [2019/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017170455 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3438714 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, B32B7/02, C09K19/30, C09K19/34, C09K19/38, C09K19/54, G02F1/1335, G02F1/13363, H01L51/50, H05B33/02 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
G02F1/133634 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/542 (KR);
C08K5/17 (KR);
C08L1/02 (KR);
C08L39/04 (KR);
C08L67/02 (KR);
C09K19/2007 (US);
C09K19/24 (US);
C09K19/30 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/3001 (US);
C09K19/34 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/3497 (US);
C09K19/38 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/3838 (US);
C09K19/3852 (US);
C09K19/54 (EP,US);
G02B5/30 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/3016 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (EP,US);
G02F1/133528 (US);
G02F1/13363 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/137 (US);
H05B33/02 (EP,US);
H10K50/00 (US);
H10K50/86 (US);
H10K59/8791 (EP,KR);
C09K2219/03 (US);
G02F1/133541 (US);
G02F1/133562 (EP,US);
G02F1/133633 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Title | German: | OPTISCH ANISOTROPE SCHICHT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, OPTISCH ANISOTROPES LAMINAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, OPTISCH ANISOTROPER ÜBERTRAGUNGSKÖRPER, POLARISATIONSPLATTE UND BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/06] | English: | OPTICALLY ANISOTROPIC LAYER AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, OPTICALLY ANISOTROPIC LAMINATE AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, OPTICALLY ANISOTROPIC TRANSFER BODY, POLARIZATION PLATE, AND IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE | [2019/06] | French: | COUCHE OPTIQUEMENT ANISOTROPE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, STRATIFIÉ OPTIQUEMENT ANISOTROPE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, CORPS DE TRANSFERT OPTIQUEMENT ANISOTROPE, PLAQUE POLARISANTE, ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2018 | Translation filed | 27.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 08.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005237440 (SUGIMURA HIDEYO [US], et al) [A] 18* paragraphs [0020] , [0029] *; | [Y]WO2007024463 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 *p.39, Example 3 *;; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP2703385 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [Y] 14-19 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004]; claim 1 *; | [XYI]US2015079380 (MURAMATSU AYAKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7,20 * paragraphs [0201] , [0236] * [Y] 5,6,14-19 [I] 8-13,21; | [Y]EP2871192 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [Y] 14-19 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004]; claim 1 * | International search | [A]JP2008129465 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1-21 * , claims; paragraphs [0007] to [0039] & US 2008/0068545 A1 claims; paragraphs [0023] to [0030] & EP 1898252 A1 & CN 101140334 A & KR 10-2008-0022062 A & TW 200821351 A *; | [A]JP2009098618 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-21* , claims; paragraphs [0022], [0115] to [0133] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015200861 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-21 * , paragraphs [0072], [0147] to [0149] & US 2015/0079380 A1 paragraphs [0137] to [0139], [0236] * |