EP3439283 - IMAGE PICKUP DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANBARA, Toshiyuki c/o NIKON CORPORATION Intellectual Property Division 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 02 /
SHIONOYA, Takashi c/o NIKON CORPORATION Intellectual Property Division 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 03 /
SEKIGUCHI, Naoki c/o NIKON CORPORATION Intellectual Property Division 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/06] | Application number, filing date | 17775257.3 | 29.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017JP12980 | Priority number, date | JP20160071970 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016071970 | [2019/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017170723 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439283 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N5/243, H04N5/351, H04N5/353, H04N5/235 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
H04N23/673 (EP,CN);
H04N23/80 (EP,CN);
H04N23/67 (EP,CN,US);
G06T5/50 (US);
G06T5/70 (US);
G06T7/11 (US);
G06V20/10 (US);
H04N23/61 (CN);
H04N23/611 (CN);
H04N23/62 (EP,CN);
H04N23/631 (EP,CN);
H04N23/70 (EP,CN);
H04N23/76 (CN,US);
H04N23/843 (EP,CN,US);
H04N25/13 (EP);
H04N25/50 (US);
H04N25/53 (US);
H04N25/533 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2019/06] | H04N5/232, H04N5/243, H04N5/351, H04N5/353 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Title | German: | BILDAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/06] | English: | IMAGE PICKUP DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2019/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2018 | Translation filed | 29.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 05.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010208099 (NOMURA KENICHIROH [JP]); | [XI]US2012069212 (IMAI FRANCISCO [US]); | [I]JP2015092660 (NIKON CORP) | International search | [X]WO2015022900 (NIKON CORP [JP]) |