EP3436025 - METHODS FOR THE SEPARATION AND DETECTION OF AN OXYSTEROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc. 2500 Silveus Crossing Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRINGTON, Roger, E. 1018 Smoky Oaks Lane Collierville, TN 38017 / US | 02 /
JACOBS, Jerbrena, C. 81 Doe Creek Cove Hernando, MS 38632 / US | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/06] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 17776387.7 | 27.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017US24295 | Priority number, date | US201615082665 | 28.03.2016 Original published format: US201615082665 | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017172612 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3436025 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3436025 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/575, C07J3/00, C12P7/64, G01N21/67, G01N30/89, G01N33/74 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
A61K31/575 (EP,US);
G01N33/743 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/06] | A61K31/575, C07J3/00, C12P7/64, G01N21/67, G01N30/89 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG ODER DETEKTION EINES OXYSTEROLS | [2019/06] | English: | METHODS FOR THE SEPARATION AND DETECTION OF AN OXYSTEROL | [2019/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE SÉPARATION ET DE DÉTECTION D'UN OXYSTÉROL | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 18.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21153543.0 / EP3827833 | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2017 | AL | 03.03.2021 | AT | 03.03.2021 | CY | 03.03.2021 | CZ | 03.03.2021 | DK | 03.03.2021 | EE | 03.03.2021 | ES | 03.03.2021 | FI | 03.03.2021 | HR | 03.03.2021 | IT | 03.03.2021 | LT | 03.03.2021 | LV | 03.03.2021 | MC | 03.03.2021 | MK | 03.03.2021 | MT | 03.03.2021 | NL | 03.03.2021 | PL | 03.03.2021 | RO | 03.03.2021 | RS | 03.03.2021 | SE | 03.03.2021 | SI | 03.03.2021 | SK | 03.03.2021 | SM | 03.03.2021 | IE | 27.03.2021 | LU | 27.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | BG | 03.06.2021 | GB | 03.06.2021 | NO | 03.06.2021 | GR | 04.06.2021 | IS | 03.07.2021 | PT | 05.07.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 27.03.2017 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
MK | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 27.03.2017 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
GB | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - SCOTT R MONTGOMERY ET AL, "A Novel Osteogenic Oxysterol Compound for Therapeutic Development to Promote Bone Growth: Activation of Hedgehog Signaling and Osteogenesis Through Smoothened Binding", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, US, (20140721), vol. 29, no. 8, doi:10.1002/jbmr.2213, ISSN 0884-0431, pages 1872 - 1885, XP055627151 [Y] 1-15 * page 1874 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbmr.2213 | [Y] - ROHINI NARAYANASWAMY ET AL, "Simultaneous Determination of Oxysterols, Cholesterol and 25-Hydroxy-Vitamin D3 in Human Plasma by LC-UV-MS", PLOS ONE, (20150413), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0123771, page e0123771, XP055627175 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0123771 | [Y] - HIROSHI SUGIMOTO ET AL, "Method development for the determination of 24S-hydroxycholesterol in human plasma without derivatization by high-performance liquid chromatography with tandem mass spectrometry in atmospheric pressure chemical ionization mode : Liquid Chromatography", JOURNAL OF SEPARATION SCIENCE., DE, (20150910), vol. 38, no. 20, doi:10.1002/jssc.201500719, ISSN 1615-9306, pages 3516 - 3524, XP055627174 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jssc.201500719 | [Y] - JOS F. BROUWERS ET AL, "Mass Spectrometric Detection of Cholesterol Oxidation in Bovine Sperm", BIOLOGY OF REPRODUCTION, US, (20111117), vol. 85, no. 1, doi:10.1095/biolreprod.111.091207, ISSN 0006-3363, pages 128 - 136, XP055627176 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1095/biolreprod.111.091207 | [Y] - INES BURKARD ET AL, "Determination of 24S- and 27-hydroxycholesterol in plasma by high-performance liquid chromatography-mass spectrometry", JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, US, (20040116), vol. 45, no. 4, doi:10.1194/jlr.D300036-JLR200, ISSN 0022-2275, pages 776 - 781, XP055627179 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1194/jlr.D300036-JLR200 | [Y] - MUTEMBEREZI VALENTIN ET AL, "Development and validation of an HPLC-MS method for the simultaneous quantification of key oxysterols, endocannabinoids, and ceramides: variations in metabolic syndrome", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, DE, vol. 408, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00216-015-9150-Z, ISSN 1618-2642, (20151112), pages 733 - 745, (20151112), XP035867861 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-015-9150-z | [Y] - HAZOTTE ET AL, "Comparison of universal detectors for high-temperature micro liquid chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071011), vol. 1170, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.CHROMA.2007.09.008, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 52 - 61, XP022296350 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2007.09.008 | [Y] - GRZEGORZ KIELBOWICZ ET AL, "Separation and Quantification of Phospholipid and Neutral Lipid Classes by HPLC-CAD: Application to Egg Yolk Lipids", JOURNAL OF LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES, US, (20150219), vol. 38, no. 8, doi:10.1080/10826076.2014.991869, ISSN 1082-6076, pages 898 - 903, XP055627207 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10826076.2014.991869 | [Y] - ROBERT A. MOREAU, "The analysis of lipids via HPLC with a charged aerosol detector", LIPIDS, DE, (20060701), vol. 41, no. 7, doi:10.1007/s11745-006-5024-7, ISSN 0024-4201, pages 727 - 734, XP055627205 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11745-006-5024-7 | International search | [A]US2015001018 (KARIYAMA OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2015118277 (PARHAMI FARHAD [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2015140059 (PARHAMI FARHAD [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [PX]US2016159848 (HARRINGTON ROGER E [US], et al) [PX] 1-20* entire document * | by applicant | US6568245 | WO2013169399 | - SCOTT R MONTGOMERY et al., Journal of Bone and Mineral Research, (20140000), vol. 29, pages 1872 - 1885 | - ROHINI NARAYANASWAMY et al., PLOS ONE, (20150000), vol. 10 | - HIROSHI SUGIMOTO, Journal of Separation Science, (20150000), vol. 38, pages 3516 - 3524 | - JOS F. BROUWERS et al., Biology of Reproduction, (20110000), vol. 85, pages 128 - 136 | - INES BURKARD et al., Journal of Lipid Research, (20040000), vol. 45, pages 776 - 781 | - VALENTIN MUTEMBEREZI et al., Analytical and Bioanalytical Chemistry, (20160000), vol. 408, pages 733 - 745 | - AURELIE HAZOTTE et al., Journal of Chromatography A., (20070000), vol. 1170, pages 52 - 61 | - GRZEGORZ KIELBOWICZ et al., Journal of Liquid Chromatography and Related Technologies, (20150000), vol. 38, pages 898 - 903 | - ROBERT A. MOREAU, Lipids, (20060000), vol. 41, pages 727 - 734 |