EP3436120 - ORAL MEDICAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McMurray Medical Group, LLC 6230 Hwy 65 NE Suite 103 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCMURRAY, Roxanne 804 Amble Road Shoreview, Minnesota 55126 / US | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/06] | Application number, filing date | 17776495.8 | 28.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017US24613 | Priority number, date | US201662314678P | 29.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662314678 P | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017172822 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3436120 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3436120 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/04 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
A61M16/0402 (EP,US);
A61M16/0475 (EP,US);
A61M25/0023 (US);
A61M16/0493 (EP,US);
A61M16/0495 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0025 (US);
A61M2205/0216 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORALE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/06] | English: | ORAL MEDICAL APPARATUS | [2019/06] | French: | APPAREIL MÉDICAL ORAL | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 22.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015136123 (DONLON KIERAN [IE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-13,16,18,19 * figures 3,4 *[I] 2,5,14,15,17 | International search | [Y]US4335723 (PATEL BHUPENDRA C) [Y] 5-6, 8-9, 24-27 * ; column 4 lines 52-53 *; | [Y]US4530354 (FROILAN FAUSTINO C [US]) [Y] 6, 8, 25-26 * ; figure 1; column 3, lines 29-31 *; | [XY]US4987895 (HEIMLICH HENRY J [US]) [X] 1, 15-16, 18-19, 33-34, 36, 38 * ; abstract; figure 4; column 1, lines 12-13; column 4, lines 20-22; column 6, lines 55-63; column 7, lines 5-8, 45-46; claims 1, 6 * [Y] 5-6, 8-9, 24-27, 36-38; | [Y]US2005183729 (FISCHER FRANK J JR [US]) [Y] 5-6, 8-9, 24-27 * ; figures 1-3; paragraph [0038]; claims 1, 2, 6, 10 *; | [Y]US8631795 (MCMURRAY ROXANNE R [US]) [Y] 2-4, 21-23 * ; figures 2, 11, 12; column 2, lines 66-67; column 3, lines 1-8 *; | [Y]US2014034060 (ESNOUF PHILIP STUART [AU], et al) [Y] 4, 23 * ; figure 6; paragraph [0036] *; | [A]US2014277066 (SCHAEFFER DARIN [US], et al) [A] 10, 28* ; figure 9B; paragraph [0170] *; | [XY]US2015202396 (ROHL JAMES P [US], et al) [X] 1, 16-17, 19-20, 34-35 * ; figures 5, 8; paragraphs [0009], [0054], [0073], [0097], [0090]-[0091], [0100]; claim 1 * [Y] 2-4, 9, 18, 21-23, 27, 33, 36-38 | Examination | US4166468 | by applicant | US8631795 | US2015136123 |