EP3519521 - THERMAL VULCANIZABLE ADHESIVE AND ADHESIVE TAPE MANUFACTURED THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/32] | THERMALLY VULCANISABLE ADHESIVE AND ADHESIVE STRIP PRODUCED THEREFROM | ||
[2022/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TESA SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Str. 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIETZE, Sebastian Lorichsstrasse 12 22307 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
ELSENBACH, Kim Roßallee 160 22941 Bargteheide / DE | 03 /
HANNEMANN, Frank Pillauer Strasse 133 22047 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
ZEYSING, Björn Am Pfeilshof 94 22393 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
SCHÜMANN, Uwe Hollandweg 26A 25421 Pinneberg / DE | 06 /
SEIBERT, Matthias Grotkoppelweg 26B 22453 Hamburg / DE | 07 /
MEYER, Katja Pflugacker 11D 22523 Hamburg / DE | 08 /
DIETZ, Bernd Bramkampredder 137 22949 Ammersbek / DE | 09 /
FLUCKE, Jasmin Henseweg 25G 22359 Hamburg / DE | 10 /
KAUS, Amy 233 East Woodland Michigan 48220 / US | [2019/33] |
Former [2019/32] | 01 /
DIETZE, Sebastian Lorichsstrasse 12 22307 Hamburg / DE | ||
02 /
ELSENBACH, Kim Roßallee 160 22941 Bargteheide / DE | |||
03 /
HANNEMANN, Frank Pillauer Strasse 133 22047 Hamburg / DE | |||
04 /
ZEYSING, Björn Lesserstrasse 3 22049 Hamurg / DE | |||
05 /
SCHÜMANN, Uwe Hollandweg 26A 25421 Pinneberg / DE | |||
06 /
SEIBERT, Matthias Grotkoppelweg 26B 22453 Hamburg / DE | |||
07 /
MEYER, Katja Pflugacker 11D 22523 Hamburg / DE | |||
08 /
DIETZ, Bernd Bramkampredder 137 22949 Ammersbek / DE | |||
09 /
FLUCKE, Jasmin Henseweg 25G 22359 Hamburg / DE | |||
10 /
KAUS, Amy 233 East Woodland Michigan 48220 / US | Representative(s) | tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Straße 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 17777791.9 | 12.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017EP72848 | Priority number, date | DE201610218978 | 30.09.2016 Original published format: DE102016218978 | [2019/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018059931 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3519521 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3519521 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09J175/14, C08G18/00, C08G18/22, C08G18/32, C08G18/48, C08G18/66, C08G18/69, C08G18/65, C08G18/75, C08G18/76, B29B7/48, B29B7/60, B29B7/72, B29B7/84, B29B7/86, B29B7/90, B29C48/00, B29C48/15, B29C48/40, B29C48/67, C08G18/87 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
C09J175/14 (EP,KR,US);
B29B7/426 (EP);
B29B7/485 (EP,US);
B29B7/487 (EP,US);
B29B7/603 (EP,US);
B29B7/726 (EP,US);
B29B7/845 (EP,US);
B29B7/86 (EP,US);
B29B7/90 (EP,US);
B29C48/0011 (KR);
B29C48/022 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/08 (KR);
B29C48/15 (EP,US);
B29C48/40 (EP);
B29C48/402 (EP,US);
B29C48/67 (EP,US);
C08G18/227 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/3206 (EP,US);
C08G18/6588 (EP,US);
C08G18/69 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/755 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/758 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/87 (EP,US);
C08K3/011 (KR,US);
C08K3/013 (KR,US);
C08K3/06 (KR,US);
C08K5/39 (KR);
C08K5/40 (KR,US);
C08K5/47 (KR,US);
C09J11/04 (KR,US);
C09J11/06 (KR,US);
C09J11/08 (KR);
C09J7/35 (US);
C09J7/38 (KR,US);
B29K2875/00 (US);
C08L63/00 (US);
| C-Set: |
C09J175/14, C08K3/011, C08K3/013, C08K3/06, C08K5/39, C08K5/40, C08K5/47 (EP,US);
C09J175/14, C08L63/00, C08L95/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2019/32] | C09J175/14, C08G18/00, C08G18/22, C08G18/32, C08G18/48, C08G18/66, C08G18/69, C08G18/65, C08G18/75, C08G18/76, B29C47/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMISCH VULKANISIERBARER KLEBSTOFF UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTES KLEBEBAND | [2019/32] | English: | THERMAL VULCANIZABLE ADHESIVE AND ADHESIVE TAPE MANUFACTURED THEREOF | [2022/15] | French: | ADHÉSIF VULCANISÉ THERMIQUE ET BANDE ADHÉSIVE EN FAIT | [2022/18] |
Former [2019/32] | THERMALLY VULCANISABLE ADHESIVE AND ADHESIVE STRIP PRODUCED THEREFROM | ||
Former [2019/32] | ADHÉSIF VULCANISABLE THERMIQUEMENT ET RUBAN ADHÉSIF PRODUIT À PARTIR DUDIT ADHÉSIF | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 30.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2017 | AL | 29.06.2022 | CY | 29.06.2022 | CZ | 29.06.2022 | DK | 29.06.2022 | EE | 29.06.2022 | ES | 29.06.2022 | FI | 29.06.2022 | HR | 29.06.2022 | IT | 29.06.2022 | LT | 29.06.2022 | LV | 29.06.2022 | MC | 29.06.2022 | MK | 29.06.2022 | MT | 29.06.2022 | NL | 29.06.2022 | PL | 29.06.2022 | RO | 29.06.2022 | RS | 29.06.2022 | SE | 29.06.2022 | SI | 29.06.2022 | SK | 29.06.2022 | SM | 29.06.2022 | AT | 12.09.2022 | IE | 12.09.2022 | LU | 12.09.2022 | BG | 29.09.2022 | GB | 29.09.2022 | NO | 29.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | FR | 30.09.2022 | GR | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | IS | 29.10.2022 | PT | 31.10.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 12.09.2017 | |
AL | 29.06.2022 | ||
CY | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
IT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
MK | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
AT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 12.09.2017 | |
AL | 29.06.2022 | ||
CY | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
IT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
AT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 12.09.2017 | |
AL | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
IT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
AT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
IT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
AT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
AT | 12.09.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
GB | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
FR | 30.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | EE | 29.06.2022 | |
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | EE | 29.06.2022 | |
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | EE | 29.06.2022 | |
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 29.06.2022 | |
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE1645358 (SINCLAIR RESEARCH INC) [X] 1-3,8,12,15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 35, paragraph 3 * * examples 17, 19 * [A] 4-7,9-11,14,16-19 [I] 13; | [XA]EP0009613 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,12 * page 1, line 1 - line 3; claims 1, 4 * * page 29, line 15 - line 21; examples 1A, 1B, 1C, 2-4 * [A] 4-7,9-11,13-19; | [A]EP0877069 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002]; claims 1, 10 ** examples 1-10; table 1 * | Examination | WO2007025690 | US2008045643 | by applicant | US3515773 | US3743617 | JPS59230076 | DE3830895 | EP0356715 | WO9830648 | EP0877069 | - SATAS, Handbook of Pressure Sensitive Adhesive Technology, (19990000), pages 153 - 203 | - cas, Database accession no. 25068-38-6, URL: stn | - cas, Database accession no. 2386-87-0, URL: stn | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, vol. 12, page 271 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, vol. 6, page 345 | - cas, Database accession no. 9011-11-4, URL: stn | - cas, Database accession no. 25719-60-2, URL: stn | - GAECHTER; MÜLLER, Taschenbuch der Kunststoff-Additive, (19790000), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 615 - 627 | - Encycl. Polym. Sci. Technol., vol. 14, pages 125 - 148 | - cas, Database accession no. 003077-13-2, URL: stn | - cas, Database accession no. 144-19-4, URL: stn | - cas, Database accession no. 115-84-4, URL: stn | - cas, Database accession no. 94-96-2, URL: stn | - cas, Database accession no. 4098-71-9, URL: stn | - cas, Database accession no. 5124-30-1, URL: stn | - cas, Database accession no. 34364-26-6, URL: stn |