EP3440128 - RECYCLING OF POLYMER MATRIX COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Composite Tech Holdings Limited 3 Bunhill Row London EC1Y 8YZ / GB | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states Composite Tech Holdings Limited 3 Brunhill Row London EC1Y 8YZ / GB | ||
Former [2019/07] | For all designated states Composite Tech Holdings Limited Tower 42 33rd Floor 25 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1HQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSAU, Jan-Michael 13525 Sunset Canyon Drive NE Albuquerque, New Mexico 87111 / US | 02 /
ALLRED, Ronald E. 5505 Foothills Canyon NE Albuquerque, New Mexico 87111 / US | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/32] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2019/07] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17778755.3 | 31.03.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017IB51838 | Priority number, date | US201662318555P | 05.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662318555 P | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017175100 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3440128 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3440128 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08J11/16, C08J11/18 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
C08J11/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08J11/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29B17/02 (IL,US);
C01B32/05 (IL,US);
C08J11/10 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08J11/18 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08J11/24 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B29B2017/0293 (IL,US);
B29K2307/04 (IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/07] | C08J11/24, C08J11/16, C08J11/10, C08J11/18, C08J11/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RECYCLING VON POLYMERMATRIX-VERBUNDWERKSTOFF | [2019/07] | English: | RECYCLING OF POLYMER MATRIX COMPOSITE | [2019/07] | French: | RECYCLAGE DE COMPOSITE À MATRICE POLYMÈRE | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 03.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.11.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 03.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 09.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101928406 (NINGBO INST MAT TECH & ENG CAS) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]CN102391543 (NINGBO INST MAT TECH & ENG CAS) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [XI]CN102558603 (UNIV TONGJI) [X] 1-5,9,11,12,14 * claim - * [I] 6-8,10,13; | [A]WO2014179939 (UNIV EAST CHINA SCIENCE & TECH [CN]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,2 * | International search | [A]WO2014169846 (ADESSO ADVANCED MATERIALS WUXI CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-3, 15* entire document *; | [X] - LIU et al., "Chemical Recycling of Carbon Fibre Reinforced Epoxy Resin Composites in Subcritical Water: Synergistic Effect of Phenol and KOH on the Decomposition Efficiency", Polymer Degradation and Stability, vol. 97, no. 3, (20120105), pages 214 - 220, URL: https://www.researchgate.net/profile/Jie_Liu85/publication/256969200_Chemical_recycling_of_carbon_fibre_reinforced_epoxy_resin_composites_in_subcritical_water_Synergistic_effect_of_phenol_and_KOH_on_the_decomposition_efficiency/links/5534e5d80cf2ea51c13354e8/Chemical-recycling-of-carbon-fibre-rei, (20170609), XP028452592 [X] 1-3, 15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymdegradstab.2011.12.028 | by applicant | CN102558603 |