EP3442143 - RECEPTION DEVICE, AND TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | For all designated states FG Innovation Company Limited Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road Tuen Mun, New Territories Hong Kong / CN | [2022/36] |
Former [2019/31] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states FG Innovation Company Limited Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road Tuen Mun, New Territories, Hong Kong / CN | |||
Former [2019/07] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Takumi-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO, Jungo c/o Sharp Kabushiki-Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Osamu c/o Sharp Kabushiki-Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMOTO, Takashi c/o Sharp Kabushiki-Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | 04 /
HAMAGUCHI, Yasuhiro c/o Sharp Kabushiki-Kaisha 1, Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai-City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 17778881.7 | 22.02.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017JP06486 | Priority number, date | JP20160077077 | 07.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016077077 | [2019/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017175502 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3442143 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3442143 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/02, H04W72/04, // H04B7/06, H04L27/26 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H04W74/02 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04B7/06 (RU,US);
H04L27/26 (RU,US);
H04W4/70 (RU,US);
H04W72/044 (US);
H04W72/20 (EP,US);
H04L27/2602 (EP);
H04L27/261 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/46] | H04J99/00, H04W72/04, H04W74/02, // H04B7/06, H04L27/26 | ||
Former IPC [2019/07] | H04J99/00, H04B7/06, H04L27/26, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W74/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/07] | English: | RECEPTION DEVICE, AND TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2019/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION, ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2018 | Translation filed | 27.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 20.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.09.2022 | AT | 07.09.2022 | CZ | 07.09.2022 | EE | 07.09.2022 | ES | 07.09.2022 | FI | 07.09.2022 | HR | 07.09.2022 | LT | 07.09.2022 | LV | 07.09.2022 | MC | 07.09.2022 | NL | 07.09.2022 | PL | 07.09.2022 | RO | 07.09.2022 | RS | 07.09.2022 | SE | 07.09.2022 | SI | 07.09.2022 | SK | 07.09.2022 | SM | 07.09.2022 | NO | 07.12.2022 | GR | 08.12.2022 | IS | 07.01.2023 | PT | 09.01.2023 | IE | 22.02.2023 | LU | 22.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2024/12] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MC | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
IE | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MC | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MC | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MC | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
NL | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
ES | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012044878 (RATASUK RAPEEPAT [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0031] - [0035] - [0049] - [0062] *; | [A]US2012213196 (CHUNG JAE HOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013107838 (LI CHAOJUN [CN], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0050] , [0061] *; | [A]US2014105191 (YANG SUCKCHEL [KR], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0056] - [0058] *; | [A]US2015249974 (LEE JIHYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0131] , [0132] *; | [A] - CATT, "The solution of the Contention Based Uplink Transmission", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-102803, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100504), vol. RAN WG2, no. Montreal, Canada; 20100510, XP050423145 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | International search | [XA]WO2015071000 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [X] 4-7 * , fig. 4 to 7; page 2, line 22 to page 10, line 2; page 11, line 3 to page 18, line 2 & JP 2016-539527 A & US 2016/0183299 A1 & EP 2874458 A1 * [A] 1-3, 8; | [A]JP2015142373 (NTT DOCOMO INC) [A] 1-8 * , claims 2 to 3; fig. 12 & US 2017/0013647 A1 claims 2 to 3; fig. 12 *; | [A] - ASUSTEK, "Consideration on random access for further MTC enhancement", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2#91 R2-153486, (20150828), XP051004200 [A] 1-8 |