EP3441197 - HUMANOID ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMINO Azusa c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
ICHINOSE Ryoko c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
NAKAMURA Ryosuke c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
YAMAMOTO Akihiro c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 17778911.2 | 08.03.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017JP09174 | Priority number, date | JP20160075745 | 05.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016075745 | [2019/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017175532 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3441197 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25J5/00, B25J19/00, B62D57/028 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
B25J5/007 (EP,US);
B62D57/028 (EP,US);
B25J13/089 (US);
B25J18/00 (US);
B25J19/0008 (US);
B25J19/0075 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/07] | B25J5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Title | German: | HUMANOIDER ROBOTER | [2019/07] | English: | HUMANOID ROBOT | [2019/07] | French: | ROBOT HUMANOÏDE | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2018 | Translation filed | 05.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 15.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]JPH0731749 (TAKARA CO LTD, et al) [I] 1 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0023] * [A] 3,5-10 [Y] 2,4; | [YA]US2009114460 (AMINO AZUSA [JP], et al) [Y] 2,4 * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * [A] 1,3,5-10; | [XA]KR20100028255 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [X] 1,4 * figure 2 * [A] 2,3,5-10; | [A]CN205097196U (ROBOT4U TECH (BEIJING) CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 1, 4 ** paragraph [0066] * | International search | [Y]JPH05285864 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [Y] 2, 4-5 * , paragraph [0020]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JPH0731749 (TAKARA CO LTD, et al) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0006] to [0035]; fig. 1 to 16 (Family: none) * [Y] 2, 4-5 [A] 3, 6-10; | [A]JP2001157972 (SONY CORP) [A] 6* , paragraphs [0059] to [0060]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2003181153 (TAKARA CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2003210857 (SENTE CREATIONS KK) [A] 1-10 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2004034169 (SONY CORP) [Y] 4-5 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0020]; fig. 2 (Family: none) * |