EP3441380 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALCOHOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIHARA Daisuke c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 02 /
TSUBAKI Noritatsu c/o National University Corporation University of Toyama 3190 Gofuku Toyama-shi Toyama 930-8555 / JP | 03 /
YONEYAMA Yoshiharu c/o National University Corporation University of Toyama 3190 Gofuku Toyama-shi Toyama 930-8555 / JP | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 17779017.7 | 29.03.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017JP12916 | Priority number, date | JP20160074920 | 04.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016074920 | [2019/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017175638 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3441380 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/00, B01J23/75, B01J35/10, B01J37/02, B01J37/08, C07C31/125, C07C33/02, C07B61/00 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
B01J23/75 (EP,US);
B01J21/066 (EP);
B01J21/08 (EP);
B01J23/002 (EP);
B01J35/60 (US);
B01J35/615 (EP);
B01J35/635 (EP);
B01J35/643 (US);
B01J35/647 (EP,US);
B01J35/651 (EP);
B01J35/66 (US);
B01J37/02 (US);
B01J37/0203 (EP);
B01J37/0205 (EP);
B01J37/08 (US);
B01J37/088 (EP);
B01J37/343 (EP);
C07C29/00 (US);
C07C29/156 (EP);
C07C29/50 (US);
C07C31/125 (US);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/156, C07C31/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALKOHOL | [2019/07] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALCOHOL | [2019/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ALCOOL | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2018 | Translation filed | 18.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 26.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0200338 (TSUBAKI NORITATSU [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 20, lines 3-17; figure -; example -; claim -; table - *; | [XY] - ZHANG Y ET AL, "Development of bimodal cobalt catalysts for Fischer-Tropsch synthesis", CATALYSIS TODAY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 93-95, ISSN 0920-5861, (20040901), pages 55 - 63, (20040916), XP027186001 [X] 9-14 * 1. Introduction 2. Experimental 4. conclusions;; figure -; table - * * Experimental;; figure -; table - * [Y] 1-7,15-17 | [XY] - NORITATSU TSUBAKI ET AL, "A new method of bimodal support preparation and its application in Fischer?Tropsch synthesis", CATALYSIS COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20011201), vol. 2, no. 10, doi:10.1016/S1566-7367(01)00055-3, ISSN 1566-7367, pages 311 - 315, XP002427460 [X] 9-14 * 2. Experimental 3. Results and discussion;; figure -; table - * [Y] 1-8,15-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1566-7367(01)00055-3 | [Y] - JUNGANG WANG ET AL, "Influence of the bimodal pore structure on the CO hydrogenation activity and selectivity of cobalt catalysts", RSC ADVANCES, (20150101), vol. 5, no. 80, doi:10.1039/C5RA10507B, pages 65358 - 65364, XP055632135 [Y] 1-8,15-17 * abstract * * figure -; table - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5RA10507B | [Y] - TAMAO ISHIDA ET AL, "Synthesis of higher alcohols by Fischer-Tropsch synthesis over alkali metal-modified cobalt catalysts", APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130501), vol. 458, doi:10.1016/j.apcata.2013.03.042, ISSN 0926-860X, pages 145 - 154, XP055632154 [Y] 1-8,15-17 * abstract * * 2.. Experimental * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apcata.2013.03.042 | International search | [A]JPS54119385 (INUI SATOYUKI) [A] 1-17 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS58180437 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) [A] 1-17 * , claims; examples & US 4659742 A1 & GB 2118061 A & DE 3310540 A & FR 2523957 A *; | [A]JPS6426526 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO) [A] 1-17 * , claims; examples 1 to 3 & US 4751248 A1 & EP 297458 A2 *; | [A]JPH01128948 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN) [A] 1-17 * , claims; examples; table 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO0200338 (TSUBAKI NORITATSU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * , claims; examples & AU 6632901 A *; | [A]US2005107479 (ESPINOZA RAFAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * , claims & WO 2005/037745 A1 *; | [Y]JP2006297286 (ELECTRIC POWER DEV CO) [Y] 1-17 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010524681 (Korea Research Institute of Chemical Technology) [A] 1-17 * , claims & US 2010/0093523 A1 & WO 2009/014292 A2 *; | [Y]JP2010532245 (Korea Research Institute of Chemical Technology) [Y] 1-17 * , claims & US 2010/0130349 A1 claims & WO 2009/031760 A1 & EP 2183051 A1 *; | [A]WO2014205059 (STANDARD ALCOHOL COMPANY OF AMERICA INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * , claims; examples & US 2014/0378560 A1 & JP 2016-523180 A *; | [Y] - TATSUYA YANAGIHARA et al., "1P26 Higher alcohol formation under Fischer-Tropsch conditions by cobalt catalysts", Shokubai Toronkai Toronkai A Yokoshu = [Catalysts Discussion (A) Lecture proceedings], (20120000), vol. 109, page 26, XP009513892 [Y] 1-17 | [Y] - J IAO, GUIPING et al., "Effect of La"2O"3 doping on syntheses of C"1-C"1"8 mixed linear @a-alcohols from syngas over the Co/AC catalysts", Appl. Catal. A: Gen., (20090000), vol. 364, pages 137 - 142, XP026251009 [Y] 1-7, 9-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apcata.2009.05.040 | [A] - LEE, JIN HEE et al., "Role of support on higher alcohol synthesis from syngas", Appl. Catal. A: Gen., (20140000), vol. 480, pages 128 - 133, XP009514049 [A] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apcata.2014.04.026 | [A] - GAO, WA et al., "Core-shell Cu@(CuCo-alloy)/Al 2 O 3 catalysts for the synthesis of higher alcohols from syngas", Green Chem., (20150000), vol. 17, pages 1525 - 1534, XP055552415 [A] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4GC01633E | [A] - TOYODA, TAKASHI et al., "Effects of Adding Cobalt and Potassium to MoS2-based Catalysts on Mixed Alcohol Synthesis", J. Jpn. Petrol. Inst., (20140000), vol. 57, pages 171 - 183, XP055552419 [A] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1627/jpi.57.171 |