EP3450528 - GREASE COMPOSITION AND SLIDING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOYAMA Taka c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 507-1 Kishi Yamakitamachi Ashigarakamigun Kanagawa 258-0112 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA Teruyoshi c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 507-1 Kishi Yamakitamachi Ashigarakamigun Kanagawa 258-0112 / JP | 03 /
YAMAGUCHI Tetsuji c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 507-1 Kishi Yamakitamachi Ashigarakamigun Kanagawa 258-0112 / JP | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17779032.6 | 30.03.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017JP13138 | Priority number, date | JP20160076254 | 06.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016076254 | [2019/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017175653 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3450528 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/04, // C10N10/04, C10N10/06, C10N10/12, C10N20/04, C10N20/06, C10N30/06, C10N30/08, C10N50/10 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
C10M169/041 (EP,US);
C10M169/04 (KR);
C10M107/50 (KR,US);
C10M125/02 (KR);
C10M125/10 (KR);
C10M125/22 (KR);
C10M125/26 (KR);
C10M143/02 (KR);
C10M143/04 (KR);
C10M145/14 (KR,US);
C10M147/02 (KR,US);
C10M149/18 (KR);
C10M155/02 (KR);
C10M169/00 (US);
F16C33/10 (EP,KR,US);
F16D69/00 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2201/041 (EP,US);
C10M2201/062 (EP,US);
C10M2201/066 (EP,US);
C10M2201/105 (EP,US);
C10M2205/022 (EP,US);
C10M2205/024 (EP,US);
C10M2209/0813 (EP,US);
C10M2209/084 (EP,US);
C10M2209/0845 (EP,US);
C10M2213/062 (EP,US);
C10M2217/044 (EP,US);
C10M2229/02 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0415 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0425 (EP,US);
C10M2229/0515 (EP,US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2201/062, C10N2010/04 (US,EP);
C10M2201/062, C10N2010/06 (US,EP);
C10M2201/062, C10N2010/08 (US,EP);
C10M2209/0845, C10N2020/04 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2019/10] | C10M169/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Title | German: | FETTZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND GLEITELEMENT | [2019/10] | English: | GREASE COMPOSITION AND SLIDING MEMBER | [2019/10] | French: | COMPOSITION DE GRAISSE, ET ÉLÉMENT COULISSANT | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2018 | Translation filed | 02.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 26.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]WO2010027019 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0005], [0012]; example 4; table 2 & US 2011/0136578 A1 claim 1; paragraphs [0005], [0012]; example 4; table 2 *; | [Y]WO2015077391 (DOW CORNING [US]) [Y] 1-15 * , claims; paragraphs [0029], [0036], [0038], [0053] & JP 2016-539225 A claims; paragraphs [0029], [0036], [0038], [0053] *; | [Y]WO2006009083 (KURARAY CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * , claims; paragraph [0014] & US 2008/0058234 A1 claims; paragraph [0016] *; | [A]JP2005054007 (COSMO SEKIYU LUBRICANTS KK) [A] 1-15 * , claims (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2001226687 (WAKO CHEMICAL KK) [A] 1-15 * , claims (Family: none) * |