EP3440843 - VIEW-AWARE 360 DEGREE VIDEO STREAMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visbit Inc. 440 N Wolfe Rd Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Changyin c/o Visbit Inc. 440 N Wolfe Rd Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/07] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17779883.2 | 07.04.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017US26514 | Priority number, date | US201662320451P | 08.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662320451 P | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017177090 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3440843 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/81, H04N21/472, G06T19/00, G06T15/08, H04N19/119, H04N21/845 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
H04N13/122 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/012 (EP,US);
H04N13/139 (US);
H04N13/279 (US);
H04N21/21805 (EP,US);
H04N21/2343 (EP,US);
H04N21/2662 (US);
H04N21/816 (EP,US);
H04N21/845 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/07] | H04N21/81, H04N21/472, G06T19/00, G06T15/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Title | German: | ANSICHTSBEWUSSTES 360-GRAD-VIDEO-STREAMING | [2019/07] | English: | VIEW-AWARE 360 DEGREE VIDEO STREAMING | [2019/07] | French: | FLUX VIDÉO DE 360 DEGRÉS SENSIBLE À LA VUE | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 19.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6567086 (HASHIMOTO ROY T [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 44 - line 57 * * column 2, line 34 - line 67 * * column 3, line 24 - line 38 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 16 * * column 5, line 50 - line 63 * * column 6, line 26 - line 46 * * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 53 ** figures 6,9 *; | [A]US2015249813 (COLE DAVID MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0079] * * figures 1,3,4,6,8 *; | [A]US2016012855 (KRISHNAN RATHISH [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] * * figures 4,5,6,7 *; | [I]WO2016050283 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - line 16 * * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 18 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 15 * * page 5, line 4 - line 10 * * page 7, line 13 - line 17 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 6 * * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 10 * * page 9, line 25 - line 27 * * page 10, line 18 - page 11, line 4 * * page 11, line 18 - line 24 * * page 13, line 19 - line 28 * * page 14, line 4 - line 15 * * page 16, line 1 - line 14 * * figures 3,5A,9,10 *; | [I] - DAISUKE OCHI ET AL, "Live streaming system for omnidirectional video", 2015 IEEE VIRTUAL REALITY (VR 2015) ; ARLES, FRANCE; 23 - 27 MARCH 2015, Piscataway, NJ, (20150301), doi:10.1109/VR.2015.7223439, ISBN 978-1-4799-1727-3, pages 349 - 350, XP055295163 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [03.1] - paragraph [03.2] * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VR.2015.7223439 | [I] - DAISUKE OCHI ET AL, "HMD Viewing Spherical Video Streaming System", MULTIMEDIA, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20141103), doi:10.1145/2647868.2654870, ISBN 978-1-4503-3063-3, pages 763 - 764, XP058058635 [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.2] * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2647868.2654870 | International search | [A]US2004086186 (KYUSOJIN HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0071]-[0078] and figure 7. *; | [A]US2012023256 (CHEN YIHSIU [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0024]-[0035]; claim 1; and figure 2. *; | [A]US2014123162 (KARLSSON KENT [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0024]-[0029] and figure 1. *; | [A]US2015264096 (SWAMINATHAN VISWANATHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0031]; claim 11; and figure 5. *; | [A]US2016012855 (KRISHNAN RATHISH [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0006], [0022]-[0025], [0033]-[0036], [0057]-[0064], and [0083]-[0089]; claims 1, 11, and 13; and figures 1A-1B, 4-5, and 8. * |