EP3538624 - MN4+-ACTIVATED LUMINESCENCE MATERIAL AS CONVERSION LUMINESCENT MATERIAL FOR LED SOLID STATE LIGHT SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETRY, Ralf Kinzigweg 14 64347 Griesheim / DE | 02 /
KOEHLER, Ingo Boecklerstrasse 23 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
RAPPHAHN, Mathias Lange Strasse 2 17489 Greifswald / DE | 04 /
JUESTEL, Thomas Auf dem Kamp 7 C 58455 Witten / DE | 05 /
JANSEN, Thomas Makarenkostrasse 38 17491 Greifswald / DE | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 17780427.5 | 09.10.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017EP75579 | Priority number, date | EP20160193525 | 12.10.2016 Original published format: EP 16193525 | [2019/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018069195 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3538624 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/74 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
C09K11/7435 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/32 (KR,US);
H01L33/502 (KR,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Title | German: | MN4+-AKTIVIERTES LUMINESZENZMATERIAL ALS KONVERSIONSLEUCHTSTOFF FÜR LED-FESTKÖRPERLICHTQUELLEN | [2019/38] | English: | MN4+-ACTIVATED LUMINESCENCE MATERIAL AS CONVERSION LUMINESCENT MATERIAL FOR LED SOLID STATE LIGHT SOURCES | [2019/38] | French: | MATÉRIAU LUMINESCENT ACTIVÉ PAR MN4+ SERVANT DE SUBSTANCE LUMINESCENTE DE CONVERSION POUR DES SOURCES DE LUMIÈRE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS À DEL | [2019/38] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 02.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 15.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2014152787 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [AD] 1-14 * claims 1-41 *; | [A]WO2009012301 (LUMINATION LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-25; table 1 *; | [A]US2015008463 (YOSHIDA TOMOKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 24]; claims 1-14 *; | [A]JP2011012091 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - PELLE F ET AL, "OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF Cs2NaBiCl6", J OF LUMINESCIENCE,, (19780601), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 61 - 72, XP001285337 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2014152787 | WO2014179000 | WO2008100517 | JPH04304290 | WO9110715 | WO9927033 | US2007298250 | WO2009065480 | WO2010075908 | US2014369036 | - Japanese Journal of Applied Physics, (20050000), vol. 44, no. 21, pages L649 - L651 |