EP3516060 - ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR THE TREATMENT OF EYE DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ProQR Therapeutics II B.V. Zernikedreef 9 2333 CK Leiden / NL | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DIEPEN, Hester Catharina c/o ProQR Therapeutics II B.V. Zernikedreef 9 2333 CK Leiden / NL | 02 /
TURUNEN, Janne Juha c/o ProQR Therapeutics II B.V. Zernikedreef 9 2333 CK Leiden / NL | 03 /
CHAN, Hee Lam c/o ProQR Therapeutics II B.V. Zernikedreef 9 2333 CK Leiden / NL | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/31] | Application number, filing date | 17781030.6 | 22.09.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017EP74133 | Priority number, date | GB20160016202 | 23.09.2016 Original published format: GB 201616202 | [2019/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018055134 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3516060 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3516060 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/7088, A61K31/712, A61P27/02 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/712 (EP,IL,US);
A61K48/00 (IL,KR);
A61P27/02 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N15/86 (IL,KR);
C12N2310/11 (IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/14 (IL,KR);
C12N2310/315 (IL,KR);
C12N2310/321 (IL,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/31] | C12N15/113, A61K48/00, A61K31/7088 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTISENSE-OLIGONUKLEOTIDE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUGENERKRANKUNGEN | [2021/12] | English: | ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR THE TREATMENT OF EYE DISEASE | [2019/31] | French: | OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES ANTISENS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES OCULAIRES | [2021/12] |
Former [2019/31] | ANTISENSE-OLIGONUKLEOTIDE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUGENERKRANKUNG | ||
Former [2019/31] | OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES ANTISENS POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE OCULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 15.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21185745.3 / EP3985117 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2017 | AL | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MK | 21.07.2021 | MT | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 22.09.2017 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MK | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 22.09.2017 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 21.07.2021 | |
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 21.07.2021 | |
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/12] | HR | 21.07.2021 | |
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | LT | 21.07.2021 | |
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | LT | 21.07.2021 | |
BG | 21.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012151324 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* claims 1-9 *; | [XA]WO2015134812 (EDITAS MEDICINE INC [US]) [X] 1 * sequences 460, 18, 115 * [A] 2-20; | [I]WO2016005514 (STICHTING KATHOLIEKE UNIV [NL]) [I] 2-20 * page 42, line 23 - line 25; claims 15, 16, 21, 22; sequences 15, 16 *; | [A] - LENASSI EVA ET AL, "The effect of the common c.2299delG mutation inUSH2Aon RNA splicing", EXPERIMENTAL EYE RESEARCH, (20140304), vol. 122, doi:10.1016/J.EXER.2014.02.018, ISSN 0014-4835, pages 9 - 12, XP028659806 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exer.2014.02.018 |