EP3518740 - A PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osstell AB Stampgatan 14 411 01 Göteborg / SE | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEREDITH, Neil Osstell AB Stampgaten 14 411 01 Goteborg / SE | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Aldridge, Christopher Simon Mohun Aldridge Sykes Limited 12 Park Square East Leeds LS1 2LF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Aldridge, Christopher Simon Mohun Intellectual Property Limited 12 Park Square East Leeds LS1 2LF / GB | Application number, filing date | 17781196.5 | 28.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017IB55969 | Priority number, date | GB20160016548 | 29.09.2016 Original published format: GB 201616548 | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018060923 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3518740 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
A61B5/4509 (EP,US);
A61B5/4504 (GB,KR);
A61B5/6878 (KR,US);
A61B5/0051 (GB,KR,US);
A61B5/4542 (GB,US);
A61B5/7225 (KR,US);
A61B5/7235 (KR);
A61B5/7275 (KR,US);
A61B5/742 (KR,US);
A61C19/04 (GB,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | SONDE | [2019/32] | English: | A PROBE | [2019/32] | French: | SONDE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 18.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/28] | 03.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5392779 (MEREDITH NEIL [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document * [I] 5; | [XI]WO9605769 (SPECTRAL SCIENCES RESEARCH COR [US]) [X] 1 * page 13, lines 2-8; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-11; | [XI]WO0027335 (ROYAL ALEXANDRA HOSP CHILDREN [AU], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 21-32; figure 1 * [I] 2-11; | [A]US2002177790 (MEREDITH NEIL [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2014072929 (CAWLEY PETER [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,11 * paragraphs [0025] - [0028]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2015282895 (THEORIN ANDERS [SE], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract * |