EP3443541 - WIRELESS CREDENTIAL PROXIMITY CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlage Lock Company LLC 11819 N. Pennsylvania Street Carmel, IN 46032 / US | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EARLES, Jeremy 300 Beringer Drive Evansville IN 47711 / US | 02 /
BAUMGARTE, Joseph W. 12536 Charing Cross Road Carmel IN 46033 / US | 03 /
EBERWINE, Todd 23880 Genesee Village Road Golden CO 80401 / US | 04 /
SHERMAN, Brian 11819 North Pennsylvania Street Carmel IN 46032 / US | 05 /
KINCAID, Ryan C. 6169 Norwaldo Avenue Indianapolis IN 46220 / US | 06 /
NEAFSEY, Jeffrey S. 15985 West 77th Place Arvada CO 80007 / US | 07 /
HOGAN, Michael P. 13190 Brookshire Parkway Carmel IN 46033 / US | 08 /
COMERFORD, Timothy N. 6314 Onyx Circle Indianapolis IN 46237 / US | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 1005 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/08] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 17783356.3 | 17.04.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017US27911 | Priority number, date | US201662323127P | 15.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662323127 P | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017181175 | Date: | 19.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3443541 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, G06F21/35, G06F21/44, G06F21/62, H04L9/32 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
G07C9/00309 (EP,US);
G06F21/35 (EP,US);
G07C9/00563 (US);
G07C9/20 (US);
G06F2221/2103 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2111 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00325 (US);
G07C2209/62 (EP,US);
G07C2209/63 (EP,US);
G07C9/0069 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DER NÄHE VON DRAHTLOSBERECHTIGUNGSNACHWEISEN | [2019/08] | English: | WIRELESS CREDENTIAL PROXIMITY CONTROL | [2019/08] | French: | COMMANDE DE PROXIMITÉ DE JUSTIFICATIF D'IDENTITÉ SANS FIL | [2019/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 26.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011285528 (WEINSTEIN HILLEL [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0034] ** paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0069] *; | [X]US2014292481 (DUMAS PHILIP C [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0195] * * figures 1-26b *; | [A]WO2015191190 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * page 5, line 3 - page 19, line 21 * | International search | [X]US2014292481 (DUMAS PHILIP C [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 13-16, 25-30 * entire document *; | [A]US9007173 (MCINTYRE JIM E [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 13-16, 25-30 * entire document *; | [A]US2015294517 (HERRALA SAMI [FI]) [A] 1-3, 13-16, 25-30 * entire document *; | [A]US2016036788 (CONRAD NATHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 13-16, 25-30 * entire document *; | [A]US2016049026 (JOHNSON JASON [US]) [A] 1-3, 13-16, 25-30 * entire document *; | [A]US2016086406 (BAUMGARTE JOSEPH W [US]) [A] 1-3, 13-16, 25-30* entire document * |