EP3526147 - SYSTEM COMPRISING A SILO AND A SWEEPING AUGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/34] | SWEEPING AUGER FOR SILO | ||
[2022/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Societe Concept Engineering 9 Route de Rennes 35130 La Guerche de Bretagne / FR | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORHAND, Lucien Le Presbytère 35370 Saint Germain du Pinel / FR | 02 /
SAUVION, Guillaume 1 Impasse Schubert 49740 La Romagne / FR | 03 /
DAGUENET, Loïc 2 Résidence d'Anjou 44110 Soudan / FR | [2022/26] |
Former [2019/34] | 01 /
ORHAND, Lucien Le Presbytère 35370 Saint Germain du Pinel / FR | ||
02 /
SAUVION, Guillaume 1 Impasse Schubert 49740 La Romane / FR | |||
03 /
DAGUENET, Loïc 2 Résidence d'Anjou 44110 Soudan / FR | Representative(s) | Ermeneux, Bertrand AVOXA 5 allée Ermengarde d'Anjou ZAC Atalante Champeaux CS 40824 35108 Rennes / FR | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 17783912.3 | 18.09.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017FR52482 | Priority number, date | FR20160059955 | 14.10.2016 Original published format: FR 1659955 | [2019/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018069592 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526147 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3526147 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65G65/46 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
B65G65/466 (EP);
B65G65/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE MIT EINEM SILO UND EINER KEHRSCHNECKE | [2022/22] | English: | SYSTEM COMPRISING A SILO AND A SWEEPING AUGER | [2022/22] | French: | SYSTÈME COMPRENANT UN SILO ET UNE VIS BALAYEUSE | [2022/22] |
Former [2019/34] | KEHRSCHNECKE FÜR SILOS | ||
Former [2019/34] | SWEEPING AUGER FOR SILO | ||
Former [2019/34] | VIS BALAYEUSE POUR SILO | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 13.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | ES | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | IT | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
IT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2517285 (DENIS ETS SA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * figure 10 *; | [A]US6039647 (WEIKEL CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1-9 * columns 2-3; example 2 *; | [XYI]FR2828179 (DENIS ETS SA [FR]) [X] 1,5,6 * pages 1-4; figures 1-5; claims 1-9 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 2-4,9; | [A]GB2518896 (GUTTRIDGE LTD [GB]) [A] 1-9* figures 3, 6 *; | [Y]US2016107849 (OLSON RYAN T [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * figures 1-2 * |