EP3518778 - CONTROL HANDLE FOR STEERABLE MEDICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/32] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAROHA, Princeton High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HOSSACK, Norman, H. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
STIGALL, Jeremy High Tech Campus 5 5656 AEEindhoven / NL | 04 /
MINAS, Maritess High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 17784216.8 | 29.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017EP74753 | Priority number, date | US201662402483P | 30.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662402483 P | US201662434093P | 14.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662434093 P | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018060411 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3518778 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/12, A61B8/00, A61B1/00 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/42 (EP,US);
A61B8/4455 (EP,US);
A61B8/4466 (EP);
A61B1/00066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | STEUERGRIFF FÜR LENKBARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/32] | English: | CONTROL HANDLE FOR STEERABLE MEDICAL DEVICES | [2019/32] | French: | POIGNÉE DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX ORIENTABLES | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 30.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007115307 (VOLCANO CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2009056316 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [XI]US2009287188 (GOLDEN JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012]; figure -; claim - * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0057] * [I] 3-20; | [A]EP2428169 (EVALVE INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015057610 (OSYPKA THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |