EP3519551 - ROBOTIC PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/26] | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place, Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | ||
Former [2019/32] | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDBO, Lars, Sverker, Ture Ocado Innovation Limited The Legal Department 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Herts AL10 9UL / GB | 02 /
CLARKE, Paul Ocado Innovation Limited The Legal Department 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Herts AL10 9UL / GB | 03 /
HEIDEMAN, Paul Ocado Innovation Limited The Legal Department 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Herts AL10 9UL / GB | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Ocado Group IP Department The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor, et al c/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 31 West Devon Business Park Brook Lane Tavistock, PL19 9DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 17784229.1 | 29.09.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017EP74913 | Priority number, date | GB20160016559 | 29.09.2016 Original published format: GB 201616559 | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018060504 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3519551 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12C13/10, B65G53/36, C12C13/00, B28D7/04 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
C12C13/10 (EP,KR,US);
C12C13/00 (EP,KR);
B65G1/0464 (GB,KR,US);
B65G1/1373 (GB,US);
A21B3/00 (US);
B65D88/32 (GB,US);
B65G53/36 (GB,US);
C12C11/006 (US);
C12H1/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | C12C13/10, B65G53/36, C12C13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | ROBOTISCHES VERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2019/32] | English: | ROBOTIC PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2019/32] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT ROBOTIQUE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 29.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2021/48] | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.07.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 21.07.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.08.2022 | Decision despatched | 12.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10023704 (HRCH HUPPMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9,11* the whole document *; | [XI]US2013220133 (PLUTSHACK MARK [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,11 * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0 18] - [0020] - [0 63]; figures 1, 8a, 8b, 9a, 9b; claim 1 * [I] 2,5; | [A]WO2013167907 (OCADO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-9,11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014195901 (OCADO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-9,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015291348 (LOPEZ ALLEN E [US]) [A] 1-9,11 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO2015197709 (OCADO INNOVATION LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * figure -; claim 1 * [A] 3-9,11; | [XA]GB2532931 (EDWARD ANTHONY MAITLAND GARSTIN [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,11 * figure 2; claim 1 * [A] 2,5; | [A]US2016272927 (MITCHELL WILLIAM H [US]) [A] 1-9,11 * the whole document * |