EP3446662 - MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIZUHO Corporation 30-13, Hongo 3-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBARA, Sohei 1-2-2-906 Tsujido Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0047 / JP | [2020/29] |
Former [2019/09] | 01 /
EBARA Sohei 8-56 Akamatsu-cho Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17785970.9 | 18.04.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017JP15565 | Priority number, date | JP20160083917 | 19.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016083917 | [2019/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017183632 | Date: | 26.10.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3446662 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/042, A61F5/04, A61F5/37, A61G13/00, A61H1/02 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
A61H1/006 (EP);
A61G13/009 (US);
A61F5/01 (US);
A61F5/024 (US);
A61F5/042 (EP);
A61F5/3769 (EP);
A61G13/122 (US);
A61G13/123 (US);
A61G13/1255 (US);
A61H1/0222 (EP);
A61H1/0292 (EP);
A61G13/0054 (EP);
A61G2200/325 (US);
A61H2001/0203 (EP);
A61H2201/0149 (EP);
A61H2201/0192 (EP);
A61H2201/1253 (EP);
A61H2201/1616 (EP);
A61H2201/1621 (EP);
A61H2201/163 (EP);
A61H2201/1642 (EP);
A61H2201/1666 (EP);
A61H2201/1676 (EP);
A61H2201/169 (EP);
A61H2203/0468 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/09] | A61F5/045, A61F5/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/09] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE | [2019/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2018 | Translation filed | 19.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 31.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2009020289 (AJOO MEDICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0042] * [Y] 3; | [XY]WO2009076483 (SPANN SCOTT [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0029] * [Y] 3; | [Y]US6428497 (CROUCH RICHARD A [US]) [Y] 3 * Field of the Invention * * column 5, line 14 - column 5, line 27 * | International search | [XY]US6007568 (HARRELL ERIC A [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * , abstract; column 2, line 23 to column 3, line 18; claims 1, 4, 10 to 13; all drawings & CA 2280318 A1 * [Y] 4; | [Y]US2004171974 (EMSKY TIMOTHY R [CA]) [Y] 4 * , paragraphs [0035] to [0036], [0042] to [0045]; fig. 3, 6 & US 2007/0198061 A1 & WO 2004/058124 A2 & EP 1578336 A2 & CA 2512393 A1 & AU 2003297954 A1 *; | [A]JP2004081638 (HOWA MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1-4 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012170763 (UNIV KOCHI, et al) [A] 1-4 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007508073 (Ecole Polytechnique de Montreal) [A] 1-4 * , & US 2005/0081865 A1 & WO 2005/034827 A1 *; | [A]US6076525 (HOFFMAN MICHAEL D [US]) [A] 1-4 * , & WO 2000/044329 A1 & EP 1210051 A1 & AU 2790099 A & CA 2298088 A1 *; | [A]US4660549 (KOWALSKI FRANK P [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]US6428497 (CROUCH RICHARD A [US]) [A] 4 * , (Family: none) * |