EP3447496 - INJECTION COMPOSITION FOR LABELING LESION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Cancer Center 323 Ilsan-ro Ilsandong-gu Goyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 10408 / KR | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Seok Ki (Changsin Isu APT. Changsin-dong) 1504-ho 101-dong 87 Jibong-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03095 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Insoo (Gangbyeon APT. Gayang-dong) 1407-ho 305-dong 139 Heojun-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07525 / KR | 03 /
NOH, Jin Hee (Hugokmaul 2-danji APT. Ilsan-dong) 505-ho 206-dong 55 Hugok-ro Ilsanseo-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 10372 / KR | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17786214.1 | 21.04.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017KR04302 | Priority number, date | KR20160049425 | 22.04.2016 Original published format: KR 20160049425 | KR20170050971 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: KR 20170050971 | [2019/09] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017183946 | Date: | 26.10.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447496 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3447496 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00, A61K47/36, A61K9/00 | [2024/05] | CPC: |
A61K49/0071 (EP,US);
G01N33/58 (KR,RU);
A61K49/0056 (US);
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K49/00 (RU);
A61K49/0034 (EP,KR,US);
A61K49/0054 (US);
A61K49/006 (US);
A61K49/0091 (EP,US);
A61K51/08 (RU);
A61K51/081 (US);
A61K51/12 (KR,RU);
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (RU);
G01N33/582 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/52] | A61K49/00, A61K47/36, G01N33/58, G01N33/60, A61K51/12, A61K9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/09] | G01N33/58, G01N33/60, A61K49/00, A61K51/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INJEKTIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR LÄSIONSMARKIERUNG | [2019/09] | English: | INJECTION COMPOSITION FOR LABELING LESION | [2019/09] | French: | COMPOSITION INJECTABLE POUR LE MARQUAGE DE LÉSION | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2018 | Translation filed | 12.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 22.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP2940474 (NAT CANCER CT [KR]); | International search | [A]KR20140083727 (NAT CANCER CT [KR]) [A] 1-9 * See the entire document. *; | [A]WO2014014956 (UNIV ARIZONA STATE [US]) [A] 1-9 * See the entire document. *; | [A]US2008147038 (HOFFMAN GRANT T [US]) [A] 1-9 * See the entire document. * | [A] - KANEKO, M. et al., "Positive Scintigraphy of Tumor by Means of Intra-arterial Injection of Radioiodinated Macroaggregated albumin (MAA", American Journal of Roentgenology, (19680100), vol. 102, no. 1, pages 81 - 87, XP055432577 [A] 1-9 * See page 81, paragraphs [2]-[3] in the right column. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2214/ajr.102.1.81 | [A] - BROUWER, O. R. et al., "Comparing the Hybrid Fluorescent-radioactive Tracer Indocyanine Green-99mTc-nanocolloid with 99mTc-nanocolloid for Sentinel Node Identification: a Validation Study Using Lymphoscintigraphy and SPECT/CT", The Journal of Nuclear Medicine, (20120529), vol. 53, no. 7, pages 1034 - 1040, XP055432581 [A] 1-9 * See the entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.112.103127 |