EP3526448 - TURBOMACHINE ROTOR WITH RADIAL BLADE SUPPORT USING A SHIM AND RETENTION MEMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/34] | TURBOMACHINE BUCKET WITH RADIAL SUPPORT, SHIM AND RELATED TURBOMACHINE ROTOR | ||
[2024/09] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 8 5400 Baden / CH | [2023/50] |
Former [2019/34] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURDGICK, Steven, Sebastian 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | 02 /
FARINEAU, Thomas, Joseph 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | 03 /
LIGOS, John, James 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2024/28] |
Former [2019/34] | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 17787767.7 | 05.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017US55349 | Priority number, date | US201615355818 | 18.11.2016 Original published format: US201615355818 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018093473 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3526448 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3526448 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/30, F01D5/32 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
F01D5/3007 (EP,US);
F01D5/326 (US);
F01D5/02 (US);
F01D5/12 (US);
F01D5/323 (EP,US);
F05D2220/31 (EP,US);
F05D2260/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURBOMASCHINENROTOR MIT RADIALER SCHAUFELABSTÜTZUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES KLEMMSTÜCKS UND RÜCKHALTEELEMENTEN | [2024/09] | English: | TURBOMACHINE ROTOR WITH RADIAL BLADE SUPPORT USING A SHIM AND RETENTION MEMBERS | [2024/09] | French: | ROTOR DE TURBOMACHINE AVEC SUPPORT D'AUBE RADIAL UTILISANT UNE CALE ET DES ÉLÉMENTS DE RÉTENTION | [2024/09] |
Former [2019/34] | TURBOMASCHINENSCHAUFEL MIT RADIALEM TRÄGER, UNTERLEGSCHEIBE UND ZUGEHÖRIGER TURBOMASCHINENROTOR | ||
Former [2019/34] | TURBOMACHINE BUCKET WITH RADIAL SUPPORT, SHIM AND RELATED TURBOMACHINE ROTOR | ||
Former [2019/34] | AILETTE DE TURBOMACHINE À SUPPORT RADIAL, CALE ET ROTOR DE TURBOMACHINE ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 15.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US3556675 (HOWALD WERNER E, et al); | [Y]GB2038959 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [Y]EP0110744 (SNECMA [FR]); | [XY]US5236309 (VAN HEUSDEN GARY S [US], et al); | [XY]EP0717168 (SNECMA [FR]); | [Y]US2011014053 (EASTMAN JOHN ALAN [US], et al); | [Y]EP2439378 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [Y]EP2642077 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) |