EP3504876 - OFFSET TEMPORAL MOTION VECTOR PREDICTOR (TMVP) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARRIS Enterprises LLC 3871 Lakefield Drive Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANUSOPONE, Krit 10725 Calle Mar de Mariposa San Diego, California 92130 / US | 02 /
HONG, Seungwook 10165 Lone Dove Street San Diego, California 92127 / US | 03 /
WANG, Limin 13641 Shoal Summit Drive San Diego, California 92128 / US | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17787771.9 | 05.10.2017 | [2019/27] | WO2017US55379 | Priority number, date | US201662404573P | 05.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662404573 P | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018067841 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3504876 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/52, H04N19/513, H04N19/426 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
H04N19/513 (EP,US);
H04N19/52 (EP,US);
H04N19/521 (EP,US);
H04N19/523 (US);
H04N19/176 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | VERSETZTER ZEITLICHER BEWEGUNGSVEKTORPRÄDIKTOR (TMVP) | [2019/27] | English: | OFFSET TEMPORAL MOTION VECTOR PREDICTOR (TMVP) | [2019/27] | French: | PRÉDICTEUR DE VECTEUR DE MOUVEMENT TEMPOREL À DÉCALAGE (TMVP) | [2019/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 27.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/10] | 19.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |