EP3516673 - SAFETY SWITCH WITH DETECTION OF THE DRIVING OF AN AUXILIARY UNLOCKING CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pizzato Elettrica S.r.l. Via Torino 1 36063 Marostica (Vicenza) / IT | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIZZATO, Marco Via 4 Martiri, 7 36063 Marostica (VI) / IT | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Maiello, Helenio Francesco Studio Ing. Ranieri Marino Strada del Pasubio, 146 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | Maiello, Helenio Francesco Studio Ing. Ranieri Marino Contrà Paolo Lioy, 24 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 17787963.2 | 26.09.2017 | [2019/31] | WO2017IB55848 | Priority number, date | IT20160096402 | 26.09.2016 Original published format: IT201600096402 | [2019/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018055598 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3516673 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3516673 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01H27/00, F16P3/08 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
H01H27/002 (EP,KR,US);
F16P3/08 (EP,KR);
H01H27/007 (US);
H01H50/32 (US);
H03K17/9502 (US);
H03K17/97 (US);
H03K2017/9713 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSCHALTER MIT ERKENNUNG DER ANSTEUERUNG EINER HILFSENTRIEGELUNGSSTEUERUNG | [2019/31] | English: | SAFETY SWITCH WITH DETECTION OF THE DRIVING OF AN AUXILIARY UNLOCKING CONTROL | [2019/31] | French: | COMMUTATEUR DE SÉCURITÉ AVEC DÉTECTION DE L'ENTRAINEMENT D'UNE COMMANDE DE DÉVERROUILLAGE AUXILIAIRE | [2019/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 26.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2017 | AL | 13.05.2020 | AT | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | NL | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | IE | 26.09.2020 | LU | 26.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/33] | HU | 26.09.2017 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MK | 13.05.2020 | ||
MT | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 26.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 26.09.2017 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MT | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 26.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 26.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 26.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003178857 (CASPI SHLOMO [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2011259060 (LESKA TOBIAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0057] * * figures 1-7 *; | [AD]WO2015028106 (EUCHNER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US2016156351 (PIZZATO MARCO [IT]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0119] * * figures 1-9 * |