EP3442195 - RELIABLE AND SECURE PARSING OF PACKETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/07] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PARSING PACKET | ||
[2020/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Shucheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 17788630.6 | 11.04.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017CN80094 | Priority number, date | CN201610278999 | 28.04.2016 Original published format: CN201610278999 | [2019/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017185978 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3442195 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3442195 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
H04L63/0245 (EP,US);
H04L63/0876 (CN);
H04L69/22 (CN,US);
H04L61/30 (CN);
H04L63/0428 (US);
H04L63/12 (US);
H04L63/1441 (EP,US);
H04L63/1466 (CN);
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
H04L9/0618 (US);
H04L9/0825 (US);
H04L9/3247 (CN);
H04L9/40 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUVERLÄSSIGES UND SICHERES PARSEN VON PAKETEN | [2020/32] | English: | RELIABLE AND SECURE PARSING OF PACKETS | [2020/32] | French: | PARSING D'UN PAQUET A UNE MANIÈRE SÉCURISÉE ET FIABLE | [2020/32] |
Former [2019/07] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PARSEN VON PAKETEN | ||
Former [2019/07] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PARSING PACKET | ||
Former [2019/07] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE D'UN PAQUET | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2018 | Translation filed | 06.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 16.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2017 | AL | 23.12.2020 | AT | 23.12.2020 | CY | 23.12.2020 | CZ | 23.12.2020 | DK | 23.12.2020 | EE | 23.12.2020 | ES | 23.12.2020 | FI | 23.12.2020 | HR | 23.12.2020 | IT | 23.12.2020 | LT | 23.12.2020 | LV | 23.12.2020 | MC | 23.12.2020 | MK | 23.12.2020 | MT | 23.12.2020 | NL | 23.12.2020 | PL | 23.12.2020 | RO | 23.12.2020 | RS | 23.12.2020 | SE | 23.12.2020 | SI | 23.12.2020 | SK | 23.12.2020 | SM | 23.12.2020 | BG | 23.03.2021 | NO | 23.03.2021 | GR | 24.03.2021 | IE | 11.04.2021 | LU | 11.04.2021 | IS | 23.04.2021 | PT | 23.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 11.04.2017 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
MK | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.04.2021 | ||
LU | 11.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 11.04.2017 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.04.2021 | ||
LU | 11.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.04.2021 | ||
LU | 11.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.04.2021 | ||
LU | 11.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.04.2021 | ||
LU | 11.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 11.04.2021 | ||
LU | 11.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 11.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006050889 (LEE JAE M [KR]) [I] 12-14 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0070]; figure 2; claims 1,15 *; | [A]US2008235258 (CHUNG HYEN VUI [US], et al) [A] 15,16 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0111]; figures 3,6A,8; claims 1,17,32 *; | [A]CN101404579 (CHENGDU HUAWEI SYMANTEC TECH [CN]) [A] 1-4,8-11 * the whole document *; | [I]US2009177894 (ORSINI RICK L [US], et al) [I] 15,16 * paragraph [0310] - paragraph [0326] * * paragraph [0384] - paragraph [0413] * * paragraph [0465] - paragraph [0478] * * paragraph [0520] - paragraph [0549]; figures 1,30,32,40 *; | [A]WO2011150346 (LAURICH LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [A] 15,16 * paragraph [0319] - paragraph [0375] * * paragraph [0442] - paragraph [0456] ** paragraph [0502] - paragraph [0524]; figures 30-34 *; | [IA]US2014068269 (ZHOU WEI [CN]) [I] 15,16 * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0151]; figures 4,5 * [A] 1-14; | [A]CN103916359 (AISINO CORP INC) [A] 1-4,8-11 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0037] *; | [I] - BI J ET AL, "Preventing IP Source Address Spoofing: A Two-Level, State Machine-Based Method", TSINGHUA SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, TSINGHUA UNIVERSITY PRESS, BEIJING, CN, vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 1007-0214, (20090801), pages 413 - 422, (20090728), XP026392279 [I] 1-4,8-11 * page 413, column l, line 1 - page 414, column l, line 2 * * page 414, column r, line 11 - page 415, column r, line 14 * * page 416, column l, line 3 - page 419, column l, line 2; figures 1-3 * | [I] - HE DAOJING ET AL, "Lightweight and Confidential Data Discovery and Dissemination for Wireless Body Area Networks", IEEE JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL AND HEALTH INFORMATICS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1109/JBHI.2013.2293620, ISSN 2168-2194, (20140301), pages 440 - 448, (20140303), XP011542045 [I] 5-7,12-14 * page 440, column l, line 1 - page 441, column r, line 23 * * page 444, column l, line 31 - column r, line 30 * * page 442, column r, line 13 - page 443, column l, line 15; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JBHI.2013.2293620 | [I] - ARASH HABIBI LASHKARI ET AL, "Wired Equivalent Privacy (WEP) versus Wi-Fi Protected Access (WPA)", 2009 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEMS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090515), ISBN 978-0-7695-3654-5, pages 445 - 449, XP031491243 [I] 5-7,12-14 * page 446, column l, line 1 - page 447, column r, line 10; figures 2-4 * | [I] - Smith, Richard E., Internet Cryptography, Reading, Mass. US, Corporate & Professional Publishing Group, (19971231), pages 34 - 35, ISBN 0-201-92480-2, XP002793585 [I] 5-7 * page 34, line 10 - page 35, line 18 * | International search | [A]EP1785907 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-24* , the whole document *; | [A]CN101404579 (CHENGDU HUAWEI SYMANTEC TECH [CN]) [A] 1-24 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102891848 (OPZOON TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103916359 (AISINO CORP INC) [A] 1-24 * , description, paragraphs [0007]-[0015] and [0020]-[0037] * |