EP3448433 - COVALENT BTK INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X-Chem, Inc. 100 Beaver Street, Suite 101 Waltham, Massachusetts 02453 / US | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Matthew 36 Clelland Road Lexington MA 02421 / US | 02 /
KEEFE, Anthony, D. 9 Bellis Circle 6 Cambridge MA 02140 / US | 03 /
GUILINGER, John 40 Crescent Street Wakefield MA 01880 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Ying 84 Winter Street Lexington MA 02420 / US | 05 /
TIAN, Xia 931 Massachusetts Ave 604 Cambridge MA 02139 / US | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17790572.6 | 28.04.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017US30185 | Priority number, date | US201662329708P | 29.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662329708 P | [2019/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017190048 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3448433 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/277, C07D209/42, C07D277/06, C07D303/48, C07D471/04, A61P7/00, A61P7/06, A61P17/06, A61P25/00, A61P35/00, A61K47/10, A61K31/505 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
C07D303/48 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
C07D207/16 (US);
C07D207/277 (EP);
C07D209/42 (EP,US);
C07D277/06 (EP);
C07D277/56 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/10] | A61K47/10, A61K31/505 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | 17.12.2018 | ME | 17.12.2018 | Validation states | MA | 17.12.2018 | MD | 17.12.2018 | Title | German: | KOVALENTE BTK-INHIBITOREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2019/10] | English: | COVALENT BTK INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF | [2019/10] | French: | INHIBITEURS COVALENTS DE BTK ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 07.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 01.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - XING LI ET AL, "Bruton's TK inhibitors: structural insights and evolution of clinical candidates", FUTURE MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, LONDON : FUTURE SCIENCE, UK, vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 1756-8927, (20140331), pages 675 - 695, (20140604), XP009506630 [A] 1-16 * figure 10; examples 11,13 * | International search | [A]US2005215603 (AKRITOPOULOU-ZANZE IRINI [US], et al) [A] 1, 2, 4, 12, 14, 20-23, 30 * , entire document, especially: para [0381], (5S)-1-(1,3,4,9-Tetrahydro-?-carbolin-2-yl)-2-[5-(thiazolidine3-carbonyl )-pyrrolid in-3-yl]-ethanone. *; | [A] - ZHENG et al., "Synthesis and Biological Evaluation of Novel Tetrahydro-?-carboline Derivatives - as Antitumor Growth and Metastasis Agents through Inhibiting the Transforming Growth Factor- beta Signaling Pathway", J. Med. Chem., (20140213), vol. 57, no. 3, doi:10.1021/jm401117t, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 600 - 612, XP055551495 [A] 1, 2, 4, 12, 14, 20-23, 30 * , entire document, especially: pg 602, Table 1, compound 8a. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm401117t | [A] - ORTAR et al., "Tetrahydro-beta-carboline derivatives targeting fatty acid amide hydrolase - (FAAH) and transient receptor potential (TRP) channels", Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20130000), vol. 23, pages 138 - 142, XP028961588 [A] 1, 2, 4, 12, 14, 20-23, 30 * , entire document, especially: pg 140, Table 1, compound 4f. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2012.10.137 | [A] - PubChem, (20151218), Database accession no. 101236951, XP055436891 [A] 1, 2, 4, 12, 14, 20-23, 30 |