EP3529584 - SYSTEM FOR STAINING OF BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/35] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR STAINING OF BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES | ||
[2024/10] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 17.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For all designated states Ventana Medical Systems, Inc. 1910 E. Innovation Park Drive Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | [2024/20] |
Former [2019/35] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Straße 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | |||
For all designated states Ventana Medical Systems, Inc. 1910 E. Innovation Park Drive Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRECHSLER, Andreas Frueebergstrasse 53 6340 Baar / CH | 02 /
GUTMANN, Oliver Florastrasse 14 8800 Thalwil / CH | 03 /
HAZAR, Melis 4239 N Rillito Creek Place Tucson Arizona 85719 / US | 04 /
HUESSER, Reto Huenenbergerstr. 12 6330 Cham / CH | 05 /
KOZIKOWSKI, Raymond 1936 E Campbell Terrace Tucson Arizona 85718 / US | 06 /
MUELLER, Daniel Allrueti 5 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | 07 /
STEINERT, Chris Anna-Neumann-Gasse 1 6005 Luzern / CH | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/35] | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 17790732.6 | 18.10.2017 | [2019/35] | WO2017EP76558 | Priority number, date | US201662410317P | 19.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662410317 P | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018073283 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3529584 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02, B01L3/00, B01L9/00, G01N1/31, G01N35/10 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G01N35/1016 (EP,US);
B01L3/0268 (EP);
B01L3/5027 (EP);
B01L9/52 (EP);
G01N1/312 (EP,US);
G01N35/1002 (EP,US);
G01N35/1009 (EP,US);
G01N35/1011 (EP,US);
B01L2200/16 (EP);
B01L2300/1805 (EP);
B01L2300/1822 (EP);
B01L2400/0439 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/35] | G01N1/31, G01N35/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR FÄRBUNG DER BIOLOGISCHEN PROBEN | [2024/10] | English: | SYSTEM FOR STAINING OF BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES | [2024/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COLORATION D'ÉCHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUES | [2024/10] |
Former [2019/35] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR FÄRBUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEN PROBEN | ||
Former [2019/35] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR STAINING OF BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES | ||
Former [2019/35] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COLORATION D'ÉCHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 15.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2003081209 (TAKAHASHI SATOSHI [JP], et al); | [XDAI]WO2015086534 (VENTANA MED SYST INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US8883509 | WO2015086534 | WO2016EP58801 |