EP3701103 - FLOORING SYSTEM WITH ENHANCED FLEXIBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lignum Technologies AG Rütihofstrasse 1 9052 Niederteufen / CH | [2023/17] |
Former [2020/36] | For all designated states Xylo Technologies AG Rütihofstrasse 1 9052 Niederteufen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÜRNBERGER, Gerhard Holsteingasse 33 5204 Strasswalchen / AT | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 17790767.2 | 25.10.2017 | [2020/36] | WO2017EP77368 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019081016 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701103 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3701103 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, E04F15/10 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
E04F15/02038 (EP,RU,US);
E04F15/02033 (EP,US);
E04F15/102 (EP,US);
E04F15/107 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0107 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0138 (EP,US);
E04F2201/03 (EP,US);
E04F2201/042 (EP);
E04F2201/043 (EP,US);
E04F2201/044 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENSYSTEM MIT ERHÖHTER FLEXIBILITÄT | [2020/36] | English: | FLOORING SYSTEM WITH ENHANCED FLEXIBILITY | [2020/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE REVÊTEMENT DE SOL À FLEXIBILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 20.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2013097959 (MICHEL YVES [BE]); | [Y]US2013192158 (CAPPELLE MARK [BE], et al); | [Y]WO2014007738 (VAELINGE FLOORING TECHNOLOGY AB [SE]); | [XY]WO2016029255 (KELL RICHARD WILLIAM [AU]) | by applicant | BE557844 | AT321529B | WO0102669 | EP1165906 |