EP3523772 - SYSTEM FOR DETECTING FRAUD IN A DATA FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Worldline Immeuble River Ouest 80 Quai Voltaire 95870 Bezons / FR | [2019/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZZER, Yannis 4 avenue Paul Krüger 69100 Villeurbane / FR | 02 /
CAELEN, Olivier Rue Baron Dhanis 59/1 1040 Etterbeek / BE | 03 /
CHARY, Titouan 32 Rue Blanche 75009 Paris / FR | 04 /
CALOUD, Joris 16 Rue Franklin 69002 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | 01 /
MAZZER, Yannis 4 avenue Paul Krüger 69100 Villeurbane / FR | ||
02 /
CAELEN, Olivier Rue Baron Dhanis 59/1 1040 Etterbeek / BE | |||
03 /
CHARY, Titouan 43 rue Flachet 69100 Villeurbane / FR | |||
04 /
CALOUD, Joris 16 Rue Franklin 69002 Lyon / FR | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Debay, Damien, et al Debay IP 126 Résidence Elysée 2 18, avenue de la Jonchère 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | Application number, filing date | 17791591.5 | 09.10.2017 | [2019/33] | WO2017EP75688 | Priority number, date | FR20160059717 | 07.10.2016 Original published format: FR 1659717 | [2019/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018065629 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3523772 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/02, G06Q20/40 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
G06Q40/02 (EP);
G06Q20/4016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERKENNUNG VON BETRUG IN EINEM DATENFLUSS | [2019/33] | English: | SYSTEM FOR DETECTING FRAUD IN A DATA FLOW | [2019/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE FRAUDE DANS UN FLUX DE DONNÉES | [2019/33] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 09.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2002133721 (ADJAOUTE AKLI [FR]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0154] * * figures 1, 2,11, 31 *; | [I]US2012173465 (HORE PRODIP [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] *; | [I] - James Lewis ET AL, "Microservices", (20140325), URL: https://martinfowler.com/articles/microservices.html, (20170531), XP055377310 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * | [I] - Chris Richardson, "Introduction to Microservices | NGINX", (20150519), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20150930124659/https://www.nginx.com/blog/introduction-to-microservices/, (20160526), XP055275708 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * |