EP3528953 - PERMANENT-MAGNET PISTON ASSEMBLY COMPRISING AN EXOSKELETON WHICH HOLDS PERMANENT-MAGNET ARRANGEMENTS FOR A PIPETTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Bonaduz AG Via Crusch 8 7402 Bonaduz / CH | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMER, Hanspeter Badstraße 8 Gyrenbad 8340 Hinwil / CH | 02 /
CATTANEO, Heidi Zollbruckweg 11 7302 Landquart / CH | [2020/29] |
Former [2019/35] | 01 /
ROMER, Hans-Peter Badstraße 8 Gyrenbad 8340 Hinwil / CH | ||
02 /
CATTANEO, Heidi Zollbruckweg 11 7302 Landquart / CH | Representative(s) | Ruttensperger Lachnit Trossin Gomoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Arnulfstraße 58 80335 München / DE | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 17791603.8 | 11.10.2017 | [2019/35] | WO2017EP75951 | Priority number, date | DE201610220424 | 18.10.2016 Original published format: DE102016220424 | [2019/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018073073 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3528953 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3528953 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02, H01F7/02, G01N35/10, H01F7/16 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
B01L3/0227 (EP,US);
B01L3/0217 (EP,US);
B01L3/565 (US);
G01N35/1016 (EP,US);
H01F7/1615 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0803 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/35] | B01L3/02, H01F7/02, G01N35/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERMANENTMAGNETISCHE KOLBENBAUGRUPPE MIT EINEM PERMANENTMAGNETANORDNUNGEN AUFNEHMENDEN AUSSENSKELETT FÜR EINE PIPETTIERVORRICHTUNG | [2020/08] | English: | PERMANENT-MAGNET PISTON ASSEMBLY COMPRISING AN EXOSKELETON WHICH HOLDS PERMANENT-MAGNET ARRANGEMENTS FOR A PIPETTING APPARATUS | [2019/35] | French: | ENSEMBLE PISTON À AIMANTS PERMANENTS MUNI D'UNE OSSATURE EXTÉRIEURE LOGEANT DES AIMANTS POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE PIAGET | [2019/35] |
Former [2019/35] | PERMANENTMAGNETISCHE KOLBENBAUGRUPPE MIT EINEM PERMANENTMAGNETANORDNUNGEN AUFNEHMENDEN AUßENSKELETT FÜR EINE PIPETTIERVORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 13.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.10.2017 | AL | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | DK | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | ES | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | NL | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SE | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | TR | 15.07.2020 | IE | 11.10.2020 | LU | 11.10.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | NO | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.10.2017 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
TR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IE | 11.10.2020 | ||
LU | 11.10.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
IE | 11.10.2020 | ||
LU | 11.10.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 11.10.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 11.10.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 15.07.2020 | |
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0605903 (TDK CORP [JP]) [A] 3-6* column 7, line 44 - page 12, line 19; figure 2 *; | [XYI]JP2012167968 (NIPPON PULSE MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,7-9,11-13,15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0023]; figure 1 * [Y] 3-6 [I] 2,10,14; | [A]EP2656917 (HAMILTON BONADUZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0048] - [0050] - [0 61] - [0067]; figures 4-6 *; | [Y]DE102012214677 (HAMILTON BONADUZ AG [CH]) [Y] 3-6 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 36]; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2011083125 |