EP3526255 - ANTI-LAG-3 ANTIBODIES AND COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chia Tai Tianqing Pharmaceutical Group Co., Ltd. No.369 Yuzhou South Rd. Lianyungang City, Jiangsu 222062 / CN | [2022/44] |
Former [2019/34] | For all designated states Symphogen A/S Pederstrupvej 93 2750 Ballerup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANDAL, Michael Monrad Solbrinken 26a 2750 Ballerup / DK | 02 /
BHATIA, Vikram Kjøller Hovmarksvej 31 2920 Charlottenlund / DK | 03 /
GJETTING, Torben Vibevej 7 4040 Jyllinge / DK | 04 /
FRÖHLICH, Camilla Nøjsomhedsvej 13. 2. th 2100 København Ø / DK | 05 /
GALLER, Gunther Roland Solsikkevej 17 4040 Jyllinge / DK | 06 /
KRAGH, Michael Læssøesgade 1A5 Tv 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | 07 /
HORAK, Ivan David 21 Cliff Street West Orange, NJ 07052 / US | 08 /
BOUQUIN, Thomas Kirkeltevej 44 3450 Alleroed / DK | 09 /
PEDERSEN, Mikkel Wandahl Forelvej 17 3450 Alleroed / DK | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 17791987.5 | 13.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017EP76188 | Priority number, date | US201662407678P | 13.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662407678 P | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018069500 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3526255 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K39/395 (IL,RU);
A61K9/0019 (IL,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,IL,KR,RU);
A61P37/04 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
C12N15/85 (IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
C07K2317/21 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/24 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/34 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/51 (CN);
C07K2317/515 (CN);
C07K2317/52 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/565 (CN);
C07K2317/71 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | 07.05.2019 | ME | 07.05.2019 | Validation states | MA | 07.05.2019 | MD | 07.05.2019 | Title | German: | ANTI-LAF-3-ANTIKÖRPER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2019/34] | English: | ANTI-LAG-3 ANTIBODIES AND COMPOSITIONS | [2019/34] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-LAG-3 ET COMPOSITIONS | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 07.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2008132601 (IMMUTEP [FR], et al) [I] 1,2,9-12,16-40 * examples 1-4 *; | [I]WO2010019570 (MEDAREX INC [US], et al) [I] 1,2,9-12,16-40 * examples 1-8 *; | [I]US2011070238 (TRIEBEL FREDERIC [FR], et al) [I] 1,2,9-12,16-40 * examples 1-6 *; | [I]WO2014008218 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [I] 1,2,9-12,16-40 * page 40, line 25 - page 45, line 4; examples 1-5 *; | [I]WO2014140180 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE IP DEV LTD [GB]) [I] 1,2,9-12,16-40 * page 24, line 20 - page 25, line 34; examples 3,4,7 *; | [I]WO2015138920 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [I] 1,2,9-12,16-40 * examples 1-13 *; | [I]WO2016028672 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [I] 1,2,9-12,16-40 * page 82, line 28 - page 106, line 25; examples 1-15 *; | [A] - FRÉDÉRIC TRIEBEL, "LAG-3: a regulator of T-cell and DC responses and its use in therapeutic vaccination", TRENDS IN IMMUNOLGY, (20031212), vol. 24, no. 12, page 619, XP055373990 [A] 1,2,9-12,16-40 | by applicant | US4399216 | US4510245 | US4634665 | EP0216846 | EP0256055 | US4740461 | EP0323997 | EP0338841 | US4912040 | US4959455 | US4968615 | US5168062 | US5179017 | WO0009560 | US6517529 | US2014093511 | WO2015138920 | - LEFRANC et al., Dev Comp Immunol, (20030000), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 55 - 77 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - CHOTHIA et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 342, pages 878 - 883 | - ALMAGRO; FRANSSON, Front Biosci., (20080000), vol. 13, pages 1619 - 1633 | - MAGDELAINE-BEUZELIN et al., Crit Rev.Oncol Hematol., (20070000), vol. 64, pages 210 - 225 | - LEFRANC et al., Dev. Comp Immunol., (20030000), vol. 27, pages 55 - 77 | - BURKS et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19970000), vol. 94, pages 412 - 417 | - WU et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 6037 - 6042 | - KIPRIYANOV et al., Human Antibodies and Hybridomas, (19950000), vol. 6, pages 93 - 101 | - KIPRIYANOV et al., Mol. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 31, pages 1047 - 1058 | - BIRD et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUSTON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - MCCAFFERTY et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - III et al., Protein Eng., (19970000), vol. 10, pages 949 - 57 | - MARTIN et al., EMBO J., (19940000), vol. 13, pages 5303 - 9 | - HOLLIGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - TRAUNECKER et al., EMBO J., (19910000), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659 | - TRAUNECKER et al., Int. J. Cancer, (19920000), vol. 7, pages 51 - 52 | - PEARSON, Methods Enzymol., (19900000), vol. 183, pages 63 - 98 | - PEARSON, Methods Mol. Biol., (20000000), vol. 132, pages 185 - 219 | - PEARSON, Methods Enzymol., (19960000), vol. 266, pages 227 - 258 | - PEARSON, J. Mol. Biol., (19980000), vol. 276, pages 71 - 84 | - OSBORN et al., J Immunol., (20130000), vol. 190, no. 4, pages 1481 - 90 | - MEIJER et al., J Mol Biol., (20060000), vol. 358, no. 3, pages 764 - 72 | - HEZAREH et al., J Virol., (20010000), vol. 75, no. 24, pages 12161 - 8 | - JONES et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, no. 6069, pages 522 - 5 | - NISHIBORI et al., Mol Immunol., (20060000), vol. 43, no. 6, pages 634 - 42 | - ANGAL et al., Mol. Immunol., (19930000), vol. 30, pages 105 - 108 | - MOREIRA et al., Proteins, (20070000), vol. 68, no. 4, pages 803 - 12 | - SIVALINGAM; SHEPHERD, Mol Immunol., (20120000), vol. 51, no. 3-4, pages 304 - 92012 | - KRINGELUM et al., Mol Immunol., (20130000), vol. 53, no. 1-2, pages 24 - 34 | - HUARD et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19970000), vol. 94, pages 5744 - 5749 | - ANDREWS et al., Immunol Rev., (20170000), vol. 276, no. 1, pages 80 - 96 |