EP3453401 - INTERLEUKIN COMBINATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wang, Mulin No.4 Row 5 Housing Area Jingmei Company South of Huaneng Road Shenmu Town, Shenmu County Shaanxi 719300 / CN | For all designated states Feng, Huanhuan 3rd Floor Tower B Bailong Building No.73 Bailong South Road Meilan District Haikou, Hainan 570100 / CN | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Mulin No.4 Row 5 Housing Area Jingmei Company South of Huaneng Road Shenmu Town 719300 Shenmu County Shaanxi / CN | 02 /
FENG, Huanhuan 3rd Floor Tower B Bailong Building No.73 Bailong South Road Meilan District Haikou 570100 Hainan / CN | 03 /
ZHNAG, Zhenying No.7-11 Tuanjie North Road Xiangcheng Henan 466200 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Linchong Teacher Dormitory No.5 Yiheyuan Road Haidian District Beijing 100000 / CN | 05 /
ZHU, Xudong No.94 Wenjin Road Nankai District Tianjin 300000 / CN | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 17792510.4 | 05.05.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017CN83203 | Priority number, date | CN201610297836 | 06.05.2016 Original published format: CN201610297836 | [2019/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017190684 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453401 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/20, A61P35/00, C07K19/00, C12N15/62, C12N15/85, C12N15/86, C12N15/861, C12N15/864, C12N15/867, C12N5/10 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
A61K38/2086 (EP,US);
A61K35/76 (US);
A61K38/20 (EP,US);
A61K38/2013 (EP,US);
A61K38/2026 (EP,US);
A61K38/2046 (EP,US);
A61K38/206 (EP,US);
A61K47/65 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/5418 (EP);
C07K14/55 (EP);
C07K19/00 (US);
C12N15/62 (US);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N15/861 (EP,US);
C12N15/864 (EP,US);
C12N15/867 (EP,US);
C12N5/0693 (EP);
C12N5/10 (US);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (EP);
C07K2319/21 (EP);
C07K2319/30 (EP);
C12N2510/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Title | German: | INTERLEUKIN-KOMBINATION UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2019/11] | English: | INTERLEUKIN COMBINATION AND USE THEREOF | [2019/11] | French: | COMBINAISON D'INTERLEUKINE ET UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2018 | Translation filed | 06.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 06.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 23.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/17] | 21.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005014642 (TRANSGENE SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 5 - page 6 * * page 11 - page 32 * * sequence 1 * | [Y] - XIN GAO ET AL, "Tumoral Expression of IL-33 Inhibits Tumor Growth and Modifies the Tumor Microenvironment through CD8 + T and NK Cells", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20150101), vol. 194, no. 1, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.1401344, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 438 - 445, XP055542796 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 444 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1401344 | International search | [XY]WO2015042521 (UNIV VIRGINIA PATENT FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * , abstract, and claims 1-17 and 54-55, abstract, and claims 1-17and 54-55 * [Y] 21-26; | [A]CN105518143 (BEIJING PHARMASCIENCES CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103501805 (BIONIZ LLC) [A] 1-26 * , the whole document *; | [A]WO03035105 (CT FOR TRANSLATIONAL RES IN CA [CA], et al) [A] 1-26 * , the whole document *; | [XY] - ROEDIGER, B. et al., "IL -2 is a Critical Regulator of Group 2 Innate Lymphoid Cell Function During Pulmonary Inflammation", J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (20151231), vol. 136, no. 6, pages 1653 - 1663, XP029329934 [X] 1-8 [Y] 21-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2015.03.043 | [Y] - ZHAO, PICHENGET et al., "IL -9 and Th9 cells: Progress and Challenges", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, (20130911), vol. 25, no. 10, pages 547 - 551, XP055438650 [Y] 21-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/intimm/dxt039 | [Y] - WALDMAN, T.A., "The Biology of Interleukin-2 and Interleukin-15: Implications for Cancer Therapy and Vaccine Design", NATURE REVIEWS, (20060831), vol. 6, pages 595 - 600, XP055438651 [Y] 21-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri1901 | [Y] - LIU, JINGET et al., "Significance of Interleukin-33 and its Related Cytokines in Patients with Breast Cancers", FRONTIERS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (20140407), vol. 5, XP055438883 [Y] 21-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fimmu.2014.00141 | [Y] - LEE, S. et al., "Cytokines in Cancer Immunotherapy", CANCERS, (20111013), pages 3856 - 3893, XP055215785 [Y] 21-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/cancers3043856 | [A] - LIANG, YUEJINET et al., "IL -33 Induces Nuocytes and Modulates Liver Injury in Viral Hepatitis", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20130429), vol. 190, pages 5666 - 5675, XP055438886 [A] 1-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1300117 | [A] - PALMER, GET et al., "Interleukin-33 Biology with Potential Insights into Human Diseases", NATURE REVIEWS, (20110630), vol. 7, pages 321 - 329, XP009178467 [A] 1-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrrheum.2011.53 |