EP3452875 - THERMOELECTRIC DEVICES AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matrix Industries, Inc. 1455 Adams Drive Suite 1190 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUKAI, Akram, I. 1455 Adams Drive 1130 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
THAM, Douglas, W. 1455 Adams Drive 1130 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
LIANG, Haifan 1455 Adams Drive 1130 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
HALE, Eric, C. 336 Bon Air Center 157 Greenbrae, CA 94904 / US | 05 /
KRESS, Gregory, L. 55 Grace Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 06 /
STEBER, Scott, A. 1200 4th Street 334 San Francisco, CA 94158 / US | 07 /
WILES, Brentley, M. 2291 39th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | TLIP Limited Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | TLIP Limited 14 King Street Leeds LS1 2HL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17793266.2 | 03.05.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017US30868 | Priority number, date | US201662331404P | 03.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662331404 P | US201662408015P | 13.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662408015 P | US201662421120P | 11.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662421120 P | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017192738 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3452875 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G04C10/00, G04G17/08, G04G19/10, H01L35/32, G04G17/04 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
G04C10/00 (EP,US);
H10N10/17 (EP,US);
G04G17/04 (EP,US);
G04G19/00 (US);
G04G19/10 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (US);
H02J7/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/11] | G04C10/00, G04G17/08, G04G19/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Title | German: | THERMOELEKTRISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME | [2019/11] | English: | THERMOELECTRIC DEVICES AND SYSTEMS | [2019/11] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES THERMOÉLECTRIQUES | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 28.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/29] | 05.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4070821 (SOMOGYI BELA) [Y] 6,9 * column 1, lines 60-65; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4261049 (KOMIYAMA KATSUHIKO, et al) [Y] 15 * column 3, lines 1-15; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US6407965 (MATOGE AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,12-14 * column 17, lines 54-68; figures 20,21 * * column 27, line 3 - column 29, line 25; figures 50-52 * [Y] 6,9,11,15; | [A]US2013087180 (STARK INGO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2,3,7b *; | [A]US2014299169 (SCHNEIDER LEIF E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2015029661 (HUANG KUNG-SHIUH [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y] - Anonymous, "Heat Sink Peltier Cooler Heat Spreaders Design | Novel Concepts", IsoSkin(TM) Superconducting Heat Spreader(TM), (20140101), URL: http://www.novelconceptsinc.com/heat-spreaders.htm, (20180104), XP055438191 [Y] 11 * page 1 * | International search | [Y]US365990 (GILES, CK) [Y] 26-27, 67-68 * ; figures 1-3page 1, lines 15-20 *; | [Y]US4070821 (SOMOGYI BELA) [Y] 25, 66 * ; column 1, lines 60-65 *; | [A]US4106279 (MARTIN JEAN-CLAUDE, et al) [A] 1-87 * ; entire document *; | [Y]US4261049 (KOMIYAMA KATSUHIKO, et al) [Y] 40-41, 81-82 * ; abstract; figures 1-2; column 3, lines 1-15 *; | [A]US5889735 (KAWATA MASAYUKI [JP], et al)[A] 1-87; | [A]US6304520 (WATANABE SHIGERU [JP]) [A] 1-87 * ; entire document *; | [XY]US6407965 (MATOGE AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-24, 28-29, 31-39, 42-65, 69-70, 72-80, 83-87 * ; figures 20-21 and 50-52; column 17, lines 54-68; column 27, line 1 to column 29, line 25 * [Y] 25-27, 30, 40-41, 66-68, 71, 81-82; | [Y] - "Heat Sinks Heat Spreaders Peltier Coolers", (20140000), page 1, URL: http://www.novelconceptsinc.com/heat-spreaders.htm, (20170718), XP055438191 [Y] 30, 71 |