EP3453118 - CONTACTLESS INTERFACE FOR MM-WAVE NEAR FIELD COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, TX 75265-5474 / US | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOK, Benjamin, Stassen 14592 Poe Ct. Addison TX 75001 / US | 02 /
SANKARAN, Swaminathan 1037 Everglades Drive Allen TX 75013 / US | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH Haggertystraße 1 85356 Freising / DE | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 17793406.4 | 05.05.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017US31196 | Priority number, date | US201615146965 | 05.05.2016 Original published format: US201615146965 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017192935 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453118 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 09.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, H01P5/107, H01Q7/00, // H01P3/12, H01P3/16 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
H04B5/72 (EP,US);
H01P5/107 (EP,US);
H04B5/24 (EP,US);
H01P3/122 (EP,US);
H01P3/16 (EP,US);
H01Q7/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/11] | H04B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Title | German: | KONTAKTLOSE SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR MM-WELLEN-NAHFELDKOMMUNIKATION | [2019/11] | English: | CONTACTLESS INTERFACE FOR MM-WAVE NEAR FIELD COMMUNICATION | [2019/11] | French: | INTERFACE SANS CONTACT POUR DES COMMUNICATIONS EN CHAMP PROCHE À ONDES MILLIMÉTRIQUES | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 06.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.04.2023 | 29.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/33] | 08.04.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/33] | 18.04.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6518853 (O'CONNELL JOHN B [US]) [X] 1,2,4,13,15 * column 4, line 6 - line 59; figures 4,6 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 1 * [I] 6,14; | [XI]EP2833512 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-3,13,15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0038] - [0040]; figure 1 * [I] 5,8; | [XI]US2015270595 (OKADA YASUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-3,13 * paragraphs [0038] , [0051] - [0061] - [ 0066]; figure 3A * [I] 5; | [XI]US2015288057 (SHIMURA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,9,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0040] - [0053]; figure 1 *[I] 8,10-12 | International search | [Y]US2649576 (LEWIS WILLARD D) [Y] 3 * , fig. 12, ref. signs 1120-1231, 1212-1210 *; | [Y]US5634822 (GUNELL GARY J [US]) [Y] 15 * , fig. 7, claims 8, 10 *; | [Y]US2002132601 (CHO DONG JIN [KR], et al) [Y] 7-9, 12, 15 * , paragraphs [0030], [0033][0035] *; | [Y]FR2827721 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 11 * , abstract, title *; | [Y]EP1425815 (TSUZUKI GENICHI [US], et al) [Y] 6 * , abstract *; | [Y]US2007279150 (VANGALA REDDY [US], et al) [Y] 5 * , fig. 1, paragraphs [0026] *; | [Y]EP2360776 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [Y] 8 * , paragraphs [0099][0100] *; | [YA]EP2573951 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 7-9, 12, 15 * , fig. 4a, 5-6, paragraphs [0030], [0077], [0084], [0087], [0099], [0007]-[0108], [0105]-[0110] * [A] 13, 14, 16; | [Y]WO2015000376 (UNIV CITY HONG KONG [CN]) [Y] 4, 19 * , claim 3 *; | [XYA]EP2833512 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1, 2, 17, 20 * , fig. 1, 25-27, paragraphs [0013], [0017]-[0018], [0021]-[0025], [0036]-[0040], [0046]-[0053], [0057]-[0067], [0028]-[0040], [0069]-[0079] * [Y] 3-11, 19 [A] 18; | [Y]US2015222004 (SANKARAN SWAMINATHAN [US], et al) [Y] 9* , paragraph [0042] *; | [Y]US2016036110 (CHENG YUJIAN [CN], et al) [Y] 10 * , claims, paragraphs [0039] * | by applicant | EP2833512 | US2015270595 |