EP3507676 - ADDITIVE MANUFACTURED PASSIVE THERMAL ENCLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2019/28] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENKINS, Kurt MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
DELANO, Andrew Douglas MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
GHIONI, Lincoln MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
STELLMAN, Jeffrey Taylor MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Townsend, Martyn Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2019/28] | Townsend, Martyn Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 17794473.3 | 18.10.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017US57068 | Priority number, date | US201615336635 | 27.10.2016 Original published format: US201615336635 | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018080851 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3507676 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3507676 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/20, H01L23/427, H01L21/48, F28D15/02, F28D15/04, H05K7/20, B33Y10/00, B33Y80/00, H01L23/40, F28D20/00 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
F28D15/0233 (EP,US);
G06F1/206 (US);
B23K26/342 (US);
B23P15/26 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
F28D15/0283 (EP,US);
F28D15/046 (EP,US);
G06F1/203 (EP,US);
H01L23/427 (EP,US);
H01L23/4275 (EP,US);
H05K7/20336 (US);
B23K2101/14 (EP,US);
B23P2700/09 (EP,US);
F28D2020/0013 (EP,US);
F28F2255/18 (EP,US);
G06F2200/201 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENERATIV GEFERTIGTES PASSIVES THERMOGEHÄUSE | [2019/28] | English: | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURED PASSIVE THERMAL ENCLOSURE | [2019/28] | French: | ENCEINTE THERMIQUE PASSIVE FABRIQUÉE EN ADDITIF | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 04.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.11.2022 | 09.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | IT | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | LU | 18.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
LU | 18.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
LU | 18.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP2527776 (THERMAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0008] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0033] * * figures 3-5 * [A] 2-11 [I] 13-15; | [A]US2014352926 (SUN CHIEN-HUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0007] - [0026] * * figures 1-5 *; | [XI]US2015119111 (HONMURA OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,7,10 * paragraphs [0112] - [0121] * * paragraphs [0160] - [0170] * * figures 1A-7, 31-35 * [I] 2-5,8,9,11; | [A]WO2015095107 (HENKEL IP & HOLDING GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 4,5,8,9 * paragraphs [0036] - [0046] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0073] ** figures 2, 5 * | Examination | US2014043754 |