EP3457336 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACQUIRING TRAFFIC LIGHT DURATION DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [2024/12] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2019/12] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Liguang 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 17795546.5 | 10.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017CN83734 | Priority number, date | CN201610317147 | 13.05.2016 Original published format: CN201610317147 | [2019/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017193928 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3457336 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3457336 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01, G08G1/056, G08G1/095, G06Q10/04, G08G1/0968 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
G08G1/056 (EP,US);
G06Q10/04 (KR);
G06Q10/047 (CN);
G06Q50/40 (KR);
G08G1/0112 (EP,CN);
G08G1/012 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | G06Q10/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG VERKEHRSAMPELDAUERDATEN | [2019/12] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACQUIRING TRAFFIC LIGHT DURATION DATA | [2019/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ACQUISITION DE DONNÉES DE DURÉE DE FEUX DE SIGNALISATION | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2018 | Translation filed | 13.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 22.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013076538 (UNO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XYI]US2014266798 (WITTE NIKOLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,12-15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0019] - [0020] - [0030] - [0031] - [0034] , [0037] , [0041] , [0044] , [0046] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0053] - [0058] - [0059] - [0067] , [0069] - [0071] - [0090] , [0110] - [0114] - [0119] - [0120] - [0129] * * figures 5-6 * [Y] 3-5 [I] 10,11; | [Y] - STEFAN SCHROEDL ET AL, "Mining GPS Traces for Map Refinement", DATA MINING AND KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20040701), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1573-756X, pages 59 - 87, XP019277108 [Y] 3-5 * page 61, paragraph 2 * * page 62, paragraph 3 - page 63 * * page 65, paragraph 3.1.3 * * page 77, paragraph 6 - page 82, paragraph 6.3 * | International search | [A]CN101577054 (VIMICRO CO LTD BEIJING [CN]) [A] 1-26 * , description, page 2, line 17 to page 7, line 11 *; | [A]CN102142197 (YIPING TANG) [A] 1-26 * , the whole document *; | [A]WO2013007075 (CENNAVI TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-26* , the whole document *; | [A]CN104064039 (UNIV WUHAN TECH) [A] 1-26 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN105976062 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD ) [PX] 1-26 * , claims 1-26 * |