EP3446798 - METHOD FOR ULTRA-LOW-TEMPERATURE CARBONIZATION TREATMENT OF BIOMASS MATERIAL, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CARBIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taniguro, Katsumori 1100, Shiobara Nasushiobara-shi Tochigi 329-2921 / JP | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWABUCHI, Kazunori Yamanote City House 103 1-30 Yamanote 5-jo 3-chome Nishi-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 063-0005 / JP | 02 /
ITOH, Takanori Residence Emanoru 17 802 1-7 Kita 17-jo Nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 001-0017 / JP | 03 /
OTA, Kumpei 2-13 Atsubetsu Nishi 1-jo 3-chome Atsubetsu-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 004-0061 / JP | 04 /
TANIGURO, Katsumori 2-13 Atsubetsu Nishi 1-jo 3-chome Atsubetsu-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 004-0061 / JP | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17795768.5 | 31.01.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017JP03383 | Priority number, date | JP20160095471 | 11.05.2016 Original published format: JP 2016095471 | [2019/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017195407 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3446798 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3446798 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, C02F11/10, C02F11/06, C10L5/42, C10L5/44 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
C02F11/10 (EP,US);
C10B49/02 (US);
B09B3/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/90 (US);
C02F11/13 (EP,US);
C10B53/02 (US);
C10L5/42 (EP,US);
C10L5/44 (EP,US);
C10L9/08 (EP,US);
C02F2103/20 (EP,US);
C02F2209/02 (EP,US);
C05F17/60 (US);
C10L2290/02 (EP,US);
C10L2290/06 (EP,US);
C10L2290/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/09] | B09B3/00, C02F11/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ULTRANIEDERTEMPERATURKARBONISIERUNGSBEHANDLUNG VON BIOMASSEMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CARBID | [2019/09] | English: | METHOD FOR ULTRA-LOW-TEMPERATURE CARBONIZATION TREATMENT OF BIOMASS MATERIAL, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CARBIDE | [2019/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE CARBONISATION À TRÈS BASSE TEMPÉRATURE DE MATÉRIAU DE BIOMASSE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CARBURE | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2018 | Translation filed | 20.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 09.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.11.2022 | AT | 30.11.2022 | CZ | 30.11.2022 | DK | 30.11.2022 | EE | 30.11.2022 | FI | 30.11.2022 | HR | 30.11.2022 | IT | 30.11.2022 | LT | 30.11.2022 | LV | 30.11.2022 | MC | 30.11.2022 | PL | 30.11.2022 | RO | 30.11.2022 | RS | 30.11.2022 | SE | 30.11.2022 | SI | 30.11.2022 | SK | 30.11.2022 | SM | 30.11.2022 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | IE | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | LU | 31.01.2023 | GR | 01.03.2023 | IS | 30.03.2023 | PT | 31.03.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
IT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
IE | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
LU | 31.01.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
IE | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
LU | 31.01.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
LU | 31.01.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
LU | 31.01.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
LU | 31.01.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
LU | 31.01.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 30.11.2022 | |
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 30.11.2022 | |
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 30.11.2022 | |
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH08132008 (NISHI MASASHIGE) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraphs [0007] , [0012] , [0013] , [0016] , [0018]; figure - *[I] 2; | [XI]JP2001019580 (WAKABA KK) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] , [0025] , [0027] , [0030] , [0033] - [0037] - [0054] - [0059] - [0107] - [0109] - [0116]; figure - * [I] 3-5; | [X]EP2486989 (TANIGURO KATSUMORI [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0008] , [0066] - [0072]; example 1 *; | [AP] - Anonymous, "Hydrothermal Carbonization - an overview | ScienceDirect Topics", (20161231), URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/topics/engineering/hydrothermal-carbonization, (20190305), XP055564725 [AP] 1 * paragraph [17.2.2] * | International search | [XA]JPH08132008 (NISHI MASASHIGE) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * , paragraphs [0007], [0012], [0013], [0016]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [A] 3; | [A]JP2001002486 (SAPPORO BREWERIES, et al) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0009], [0010], [0015], [0016] (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2001019580 (WAKABA KK) [X] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0001], [0015], [0025], [0027], [0030], [0033], [0034], [0037], [0054] to [0059]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009249240 (TANIGUROGUMI KK) [A] 1-6* , claims 1 to 3; paragraph [0001] & US 2011/0021862 A1 paragraph [0001]; claims 13 to 15 & WO 2009/125670 A1 & EP 2275394 A1 & KR 10-2010-0126788 A & CN 101998941 A *; | [A]JP2011189268 (NEW IND RES ORGANIZATION, et al) [A] 1-6 * , claims 1, 4, 9; paragraphs [0055] to [0058] (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2012093529 (KANSEIGIKEN ENGINEERING CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * , claims 1, 9, 11; paragraphs [0026], [0035], [0036], [0043], [0046], [0051], [0054], [0068] (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2012105240 (CHIKYU VACCINE CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0035], [0052], [0055], [0059]; claims 1, 3 & CN 103459053 A * | Examination | US4139640 |