EP3457188 - LENS DRIVING DEVICE, CAMERA MODULE, AND OPTICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jung Cheol 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Jin Suk 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Sang Ok 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Tae Bong 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | 05 /
SHIN, Seung Taek 98 Huam-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04637 / KR | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 17796347.7 | 08.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017KR04771 | Priority number, date | KR20160056218 | 09.05.2016 Original published format: KR 20160056218 | KR20160082896 | 30.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160082896 | KR20160082901 | 30.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160082901 | KR20160089090 | 14.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160089090 | KR20160089093 | 14.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160089093 | [2019/12] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017196047 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3457188 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/09, G02B3/10, G03B5/00, H04N5/232, G02B7/10, G02B7/02, G03B3/10 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
G03B3/10 (EP,US);
G02B7/10 (EP,CN,US);
G02B7/09 (EP,CN,US);
G02B27/646 (CN,US);
G02B3/10 (EP,CN,US);
G02B7/02 (EP,CN,US);
G03B13/36 (CN,US);
G03B30/00 (CN);
G03B5/00 (EP,CN,US);
G03B5/04 (CN,US);
H02K11/215 (CN,US);
H02K41/0356 (CN,US);
H02K5/24 (CN,US);
H04N23/53 (CN,US);
H04N23/54 (CN,US);
H04N23/55 (CN,US);
H04N23/60 (EP,CN,US);
G03B2205/0015 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Title | German: | LINSENANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG, KAMERAMODUL UND OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/12] | English: | LENS DRIVING DEVICE, CAMERA MODULE, AND OPTICAL DEVICE | [2019/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT D'OBJECTIF, MODULE DE CAMÉRA ET DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2018 | Translation filed | 07.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 04.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2014226224 (CHO YING-CHI [TW], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-15 * paragraphs [0032] , [0 33]; figure 1 * [A] 5,6; | [YA]KR20150128263 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-4,7-15 * the whole document * [A] 5,6; | [Y]US2016048033 (KIM JUNG CHEOL [KR], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-15* paragraph [0207]; figure 6 * | International search | [A]KR20130007120U (WAH HONG INDUSTRIAL CORP.) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0012]-[0022] and figures 1, 2. *; | [Y]JP2014153718 (HWA HONG IND CORP) [Y] 1-4, 7-15 * See paragraphs [0010], [0011] and figure 1. *; | [YA]KR20150128263 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-4, 7-15 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0081], [0106]-[0110], [0195] and figures 2, 8, 9, 13-17. * [A] 5, 6; | [A]JP2016017977 (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO LTD ) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0022] and figure 2. *; | [A]JP2016020992 (IWATANI INT CORP) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0024], [0025] and figure 2. * |