EP3455203 - VINYLOGOUS PHENETHYLAMINES AS NEUROTRANSMITTER RELEASERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research Triangle Institute 3040 East Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2021/38] |
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states Research Triangle Institute 3040 Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | ||
Former [2019/12] | For all designated states Research Triangle Institute 3040 Cornwallis Road P.O. Box 12194 Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOUGH, Bruce 3417 Trinity Farms Road Raleigh, NC 27607 / US | 02 /
DECKER, Ann 5910 Forest Ridge Drive Durham, NC 27713 / US | 03 /
ROTHMAN, Richard 12719 Folly Quarter Rd. Ellicott City, MD 21042 / US | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2019/12] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17796833.6 | 11.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017US32143 | Priority number, date | US201662335191P | 12.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662335191 P | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017197101 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3455203 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3455203 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07C211/28, A61K31/135, A61K31/137, A61P25/30 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
C07C211/28 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (US);
A61P25/30 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | C07C211/28, A61K31/135, A61K31/137 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VINYLOGE PHENETHYLAMINE ALS NEUROTRANSMITTERFREISETZER | [2019/12] | English: | VINYLOGOUS PHENETHYLAMINES AS NEUROTRANSMITTER RELEASERS | [2019/12] | French: | PHÉNÉTHYLAMINES VINYLOGUES À TITRE DE LIBÉRATEURS DE NEUROTRANSMETTEURS | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 14.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2017 | AL | 22.09.2021 | AT | 22.09.2021 | CY | 22.09.2021 | CZ | 22.09.2021 | DK | 22.09.2021 | EE | 22.09.2021 | FI | 22.09.2021 | HR | 22.09.2021 | LT | 22.09.2021 | LV | 22.09.2021 | MC | 22.09.2021 | MK | 22.09.2021 | MT | 22.09.2021 | NL | 22.09.2021 | PL | 22.09.2021 | RO | 22.09.2021 | RS | 22.09.2021 | SE | 22.09.2021 | SI | 22.09.2021 | SK | 22.09.2021 | SM | 22.09.2021 | TR | 22.09.2021 | BG | 22.12.2021 | NO | 22.12.2021 | GR | 23.12.2021 | IS | 22.01.2022 | PT | 24.01.2022 | IE | 11.05.2022 | LU | 11.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.05.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
MK | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
TR | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 11.05.2022 | ||
LU | 11.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 11.05.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
MK | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 11.05.2022 | ||
LU | 11.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 11.05.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 11.05.2022 | ||
LU | 11.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 11.05.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 11.05.2022 | ||
LU | 11.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 11.05.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 11.05.2022 | ||
LU | 11.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 11.05.2022 | ||
LU | 11.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
IE | 11.05.2022 | ||
LU | 11.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
LU | 11.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
LU | 11.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 22.09.2021 | |
NO | 22.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0706994 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 10, line 35 *; | [X]WO9833765 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 29, line 14 *; | [X]WO0023418 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 44, line 4 *; | [X]US6337351 (DULL GARY MAURICE [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 29, line 21 * * column 30, line 56 * * column 33, line 29 * * column 35, lines 51-52 * * column 37, line 46 * * column 38, lines 45-46 * * column 39, line 55 * * column 40, lines 64-65 * * column 41, lines 58-59 *; | [X]WO2004071445 (PHARMACOPEIA DRUG DISCOVERY [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8 * page 21, paragraph 54 * * page 22, paragraph 57 * * page 24 * * page 27, lines 1, 5 * * page 28, paragraph 64 *; | [X]US2006069261 (BONNEAU PIERRE [CA], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * page 24; compound 9.2 *; | [X]WO2006044823 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * page 172; example 166 *; | [X]WO2008009613 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * page 45; compounds 88a,b,c * * page 46; compound 92 *; | [X]US2010168094 (BINCH HAYLEY [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * page 61, paragraph 522 - page 62, paragraph 526 *; | [A]WO2010121022 (RES TRIANGLE INST [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2281801 (RAGACTIVES S L U [ES]) [X] 1-4 * page 15, paragraph 80 *; | [X]WO2011103189 (UWM RES FOUNDATION INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9 * page 111, line 8 - page 112, line 1; claim 32 * * claim 57 * * page 102; compound 119 *; | [X]WO2013048982 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 74, line 25 - page 75 *; | [X]US2014171447 (JOHNSON MICHAEL R [US]) [X] 1,7,8 * page 103; compound 176 * * page 104; compound 177 *; | [X] - SALVANT, JUSTIN M. ET AL, "Regioselective Base-Mediated Cyclizations of Mono-N-acylpropargylguanidines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2017:885550, URL: STN, XP002794443 [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * | [P] - SALVANT, JUSTIN M. ET AL, "Regioselective Base-Mediated Cyclizations of Mono-N-acylpropargylguanidines", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY , 82(13), 6958-6967 CODEN: JOCEAH; ISSN: 0022-3263, (2017), doi:10.1021/ACS.JOC.7B00639 10.1021/ACS.JOC.7B00639 | [X] - YU, ZHIYI ET AL, "Structure-Affinity Relationships (SARs) and Structure-Kinetics Relationships (SKRs) of Kv11.1 Blockers", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2015:1100250, URL: STN, XP002794444 [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * | [ ] - YU, ZHIYI ET AL, "Structure-Affinity Relationships (SARs) and Structure-Kinetics Relationships (SKRs) of Kv11.1 Blockers", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY , 58(15), 5916-5929 CODEN: JMCMAR; ISSN: 0022-2623, (2015), doi:10.1021/ACS.JMEDCHEM.5B00518 10.1021/ACS.JMEDCHEM.5B00518 | [X] - DUFFEY, MATTHEW O. ET AL, "Discovery of a Potent and Orally Bioavailable Benzolactam-Derived Inhibitor of Polo-Like Kinase 1 (MLN0905)", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2011:1443586, URL: STN, XP002794445 [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * | [ ] - DUFFEY, MATTHEW O. ET AL, "Discovery of a Potent and Orally Bioavailable Benzolactam-Derived Inhibitor of Polo-Like Kinase 1 (MLN0905)", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY , 55(1), 197-208 CODEN: JMCMAR; ISSN: 0022-2623, (2012), doi:10.1021/JM2011172 10.1021/JM2011172 | [X] - KWATRA, MADAN M. ET AL, "Acetylenics. 2. Synthesis and pharmacology of certain N,N-dialkyl-3-phenylpropyn-2-amines and some analogs with tryptamine-like behavioral effects in mice", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1978:83447, URL: STN, XP002794446 [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * | [ ] - KWATRA, MADAN M. ET AL, "Acetylenics. 2. Synthesis and pharmacology of certain N,N-dialkyl-3-phenylpropyn-2-amines and some analogs with tryptamine-like behavioral effects in mice", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY , 21(3), 253-7 CODEN: JMCMAR; ISSN: 0022-2623, (1978), doi:10.1021/JM00201A003 10.1021/JM00201A003 | [X] - RODRIGUES, NUNO ET AL, "Synthesis and structure-activity relationship study of substituted caffeate esters as antinociceptive agents modulating the TREK-1 channel", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2014:367344, URL: STN, XP002794447 [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [ ] - RODRIGUES, NUNO ET AL, "Synthesis and structure-activity relationship study of substituted caffeate esters as antinociceptive agents modulating the TREK-1 channel", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY , 75, 391-402 CODEN: EJMCA5; ISSN: 0223-5234, (2014), doi:10.1016/J.EJMECH.2014.01.049 10.1016/J.EJMECH.2014.01.049 | [X] - DEWAL, MAHENDER B. ET AL, "Thieno[2,3-d]pyrimidinedione derivatives as antibacterial agents", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2012:630616, URL: STN, XP002794448 [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [ ] - DEWAL, MAHENDER B. ET AL, "Thieno[2,3-d]pyrimidinedione derivatives as antibacterial agents", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY , 51, 145-153 CODEN: EJMCA5; ISSN: 0223-5234, (2012), doi:10.1016/J.EJMECH.2012.02.035 10.1016/J.EJMECH.2012.02.035 | [X] - REN, YONG ET AL, "Synthesis and antiarrhythmic activity of (erythro)-phenylpropanediolamine compounds", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1997:803082, URL: STN, XP002794449 [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [XP] - ANN M. DECKER ET AL, "The biogenic amine transporter activity of vinylogous amphetamine analogs", MEDCHEMCOMM, United Kingdom, (20160630), vol. 7, no. 8, doi:10.1039/C6MD00245E, ISSN 2040-2503, pages 1657 - 1663, XP055624366 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C6MD00245E | [XP] - JIE LIU ET AL, "Catalytic Asymmetric Umpolung Allylation of Imines", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20160928), vol. 138, no. 40, doi:10.1021/jacs.6b05288, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 13103 - 13106, XP055626672 [XP] 1-6 * page 13105; table 2; compound 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jacs.6b05288 | International search | [X]US2013296271 (SAKAI MASAAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1, 7-8 * See paragraph [0169]. *; | [X]US2014336216 (DVORAK CURT A [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * See claim 7; paragraphs [0019], [0028]. *; | [X] - Chemical Abstract Compoun, (19870418), Database accession no. 107638-85-7, URL: STN, XP055445233 [X] 1-4 * See the whole document. * | [X] - PARPART, S. et al., "Synthes is of optically pure (S)-2-amino-5-arylpent- 4-ynoic acids by Sonogashira reactions and their potential use as highly selective potent inhibitors of aldose reductase", RSC Advances, (20150000), vol. 5, pages 107400 - 107412, XP055439637 [X] 1, 7-8 * See scheme 5. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5RA22407A | [A] - KALIX, P. et al., "Differential effect of phenylpropyl- and phenylpentenyl-khatamines on the release of radioactivity from rabbit atria prelabelled with 3H-noradrenaline", Pharmaceutica acta Helvetiae, (19870000), vol. 62, no. 12, pages 332 - 334, XP009514578 [A] 1-12 * See the whole document. * | by applicant | WO2010121022 | - KALIX, P. et al., "Differential effect of phenylpropyl- and phenylpentenyl-khatamines on the release of radioactivity from rabbit atria prelabelled with 3H-noradrenaline", Pharmaceutica acta Helvetiae, (19870000), vol. 62, no. 12, pages 332 - 334, XP009514578 |