EP3454908 - TARGETED CONSTRUCTS AND FORMULATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tarveda Therapeutics, Inc. 134 Coolidge Avenue Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Brian H. 998 Salem Street Malden, Massachusetts 02148 / US | 02 /
MOREAU, Benoît 63 Charlesbank Rd Newton, Massachusetts 02458 / US | 03 /
BILODEAU, Mark T. 36 River St. Apt 323 Waltham, Massachusetts 02453 / US | 04 /
KADIYALA, Sudhakar 40 Hagen Road Newton, Massachusetts 02459 / US | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 17796921.9 | 12.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017US32366 | Priority number, date | US201662336120P | 13.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662336120 P | US201762476123P | 24.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762476123 P | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017197241 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3454908 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/54, A61K47/55, A61K47/60, A61K47/64, A61K47/66, A61P35/00 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
A61K47/60 (EP);
A61K47/66 (US);
A61K47/42 (US);
A61K47/55 (US);
A61K47/64 (EP,US);
A61K47/643 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | A61K47/54, A61K47/55, A61K47/64, A61K47/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Title | German: | GEZIELTE KONSTRUKTE UND FORMULIERUNGEN DARAUS | [2019/12] | English: | TARGETED CONSTRUCTS AND FORMULATIONS THEREOF | [2019/12] | French: | CONSTRUCTIONS CIBLÉES ET LEURS FORMULATIONS | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 10.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]US9216228 (KRATZ FELIX [DE]) [XD] 1-14 * figures 1, 2, 4 * * column 1, lines 4-8 * * column 3, lines 14-64 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, lines 6-47 * * column 4, line 48 - column 7, line 54 * * column 7, line 55 - column 9, line 20 * * column 9, lines 22-25 * * column 9, lines 26-32 * * column 9, line 43 - column 10, line 63 * * column 11, lines 1-22 * [I] 15; | [XI] - C. MULLER ET AL, "DOTA Conjugate with an Albumin-Binding Entity Enables the First Folic Acid-Targeted 177Lu-Radionuclide Tumor Therapy in Mice", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, US, (20130101), vol. 54, no. 1, doi:10.2967/jnumed.112.107235, ISSN 0161-5505, pages 124 - 131, XP055242492 [X] 1-10,12-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * [I] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.112.107235 | International search | [XY]WO2015188934 (3B PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6, 8, 10-14, 17, 18, 20-32, 34, 37, 38, (40-45)/(1-6, 8, 10-14, 17, 18, 20-32, 34, 37, 38) * abstract, pg 2, Embodiment 2, pg 5, para 1, pg 29, compound 16, pg 27, Embodiments 56-57, 59; pg 36, Embodiment 62, pg 51, Embodiment 73, pg 56, Embodiment 119, pg 57, Embodiment 124, 128, pg 58, Embodiment 131, pg 213, Example 12, pg 124, para 4, pg 126, compounds (60) and (61), pg 142, para 1, pg 144, para 1, pg 145, Table 10, pg 158, last para, pg 186, para 6, pg 227, para 1, pg 270, para 1, Table * [Y] 7, 35, (40-45)/(7,35); | [Y] - QI, Wen-Wen et al., "Doxorubicin-Loaded Glycyrrhetinic Acid Modified Recombinant Human Serum Albumin Nanoparticles for Targeting Liver Tumor Chemotherapy", Mol. Pharmaceutics, (20150302), vol. 12, no. 3, doi:10.1021/mp500394v, pages 675 - 683, XP055449376 [Y] 7, 35, (40-45)/(7, 35) * ; abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/mp500394v |