EP3454991 - MAGNETIC SEPARATION SYSTEM AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc. 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, FL 32611 / US | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBSON, Jon, P. 10203 Sw 49th Lane Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | 02 /
FINGER-BAKER, Issac Ernest, Philip 2515 Birnam Woods Way Gainesville, FL 32605 / US | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Vanzini, Christian, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 17796945.8 | 12.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017US32431 | Priority number, date | US201662335103P | 12.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662335103 P | US201662383088P | 02.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662383088 P | US201662398064P | 22.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662398064 P | [2019/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017197278 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3454991 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B03C1/025, B03C1/00, B03C1/02, B03C1/035, B03C1/04, B03C1/08, B01L3/00, B03C1/28, B03C1/01, B03C1/033 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
B03C1/288 (EP,US);
B01L3/502761 (EP);
B03C1/002 (EP,US);
B03C1/01 (EP,US);
B03C1/0332 (EP,US);
B03C1/0335 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0652 (EP);
B01L2200/0668 (EP);
B01L2400/043 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | B03C1/025, B03C1/00, B03C1/02, B03C1/035, B03C1/04, B03C1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Title | German: | MAGNETTRENNSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/12] | English: | MAGNETIC SEPARATION SYSTEM AND DEVICES | [2019/12] | French: | SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIFS DE SÉPARATION MAGNÉTIQUE | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 02.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/16] | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009053799 (CHANG-YEN DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,11,12,14 * Section Experimental Setup;; figures 1,3,4,6 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraphs [0070] , [0 84] * [I] 4,6,8-10,13; | [XI]US6132607 (CHEN CHING-JEN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10,14 * figures 1-3,6 * * column 9, line 6 - column 10, line 51 * * claims 27,28 * [I] 4,6,8,11-13; | [XI]US2012024770 (YING JACKIE Y [SG], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-12,14 * figures 1-3,5 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0054] * [I] 6,8,13; | [XI]US2009220932 (INGBER DONALD E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11,12,14 * figures 1,2,4 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraphs [0029] , [0033] , [0034] , [0042] , [0043] * [I] 5-10,13; | [XI]US4910148 (SORENSEN OTTO [NO], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9,10,14 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 42 * [I] 4-6,8,11-13; | [XI]US2007199901 (CAMPAGNOLO RAYMOND [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9,10,14 * figures 1,2,5 * * paragraphs [0039] , [0 71] - paragraph [0076] * [I] 5,7,8,11-13 | [XI] - KAZUNORI HOSHINO ET AL, "Microchip-based immunomagnetic detection of circulating tumor cells", LAB ON A CHIP, (20110101), vol. 11, no. 20, doi:10.1039/c1lc20270g, ISSN 1473-0197, page 3449, XP055206291 [X] 1-3,5,9,10,14 * Chapter "Experimental Setup";; figures 2,3 * [I] 4,6-8,11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1lc20270g | International search | [X]US2009053799 (CHANG-YEN DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 7, 8, 14-16 * entire document *; | [A]US6132607 (CHEN CHING-JEN [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 7, 8, 14-16 * entire document *; | [A]US9114403 (DE LANGE DOUGLAS SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-5, 7, 8, 14-16 * entire document *; | [A]US6136182 (DOLAN GERALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 7, 8, 14-16 * entire document * | by applicant | US2009053799 | US6132607 | US2012024770 | US2009220932 | US4910148 | US2007199901 | - KAZUNORI et al., "Microchip-based immunomagnetic detection of circulating tumor cells", Lab on a Chip, (20110101), vol. 11, no. 20, doi:10.1039/c1lc20270g, page 3449, XP055206291 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1lc20270g |