EP3541574 - SETTING APPLIANCE WITH AXIALLY BLOCKABLE DRIVE SHAFTS, SETTING METHOD AND EXPANSION ANCHOR THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Huu, Toan Im Eichpark 3 9453 Eichberg / CH | 02 /
NOSER, Martin Jedergass 108 9487 Gamprin / LI | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 17797309.6 | 07.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017EP78451 | Priority number, date | EP20160199246 | 17.11.2016 Original published format: EP 16199246 | [2019/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018091313 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541574 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25B31/00, F16B13/00, F16B13/12, F16B13/08 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
B25B31/00 (EP,US);
F16B13/002 (EP,US);
F16B13/0833 (EP,US);
F16B13/126 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/39] | B25B31/00, F16B13/00, F16B13/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | SETZGERÄT MIT AXIAL SPERRBAREN ANTRIEBSWELLEN, SETZVERFAHREN UND SPREIZANKER HIERFÜR | [2019/39] | English: | SETTING APPLIANCE WITH AXIALLY BLOCKABLE DRIVE SHAFTS, SETTING METHOD AND EXPANSION ANCHOR THEREFOR | [2019/39] | French: | APPAREIL DE POSE À ARBRES D'ENTRAÎNEMENT VERROUILLABLES AXIAUX, PROCÉDÉ DE POSE ET ÉLÉMENT D'ANCRAGE À EXPANSION CORRESPONDANT | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 17.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2021/46] | 14.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/30] | 18.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE9002569U (OETTL, REINHOLD) [X] 1,6-8,10,11 * page 3, line 3 - line 28; figures 1,2 * [I] 2,9; | [X]DE1885659U (SUEDD SPINDELWERKE ZINSER DIPL [DE]) [X] 12-14 * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 1; figures 1, 2 *; | [X]EP1957806 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [X] 12-14 * paragraph [0026]; figures 1,2,7 *; | [A]EP1477619 (ZEN KENCHIKU SEKKEI JIMUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 10,11 * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0100]; figures 39, 40 *; | [A]US2009302088 (SANTAMARINA ALAND [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2614928 (UIP GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2617212 | DE102012221114 | DE7634992U | US2707897 | JPS6099311U | DE102008044124 | DE102007000235 | US6250866 | US2008008553 | US8662806 | US8266779 | EP0845605 | US7070376 | US4386882 | US8070405 | EP2366869 | DE102011003290 | DE9002569U | DE1885659U | EP1957806 | WO2007086988 | EP20160159173 |