EP3531926 - DEVICES FOR EXCLUDING THE LEFT ATRIAL APPENDAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/36] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR EXCLUDING THE LEFT ATRIAL APPENDAGE | ||
[2024/26] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 30.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conformal Medical, Inc. 21 Continental Boulevard Suite 4 Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELANSON, David, A. 5 Schaefer Circle Hudson, NH 03051 / US | 02 /
LEVINE, Andy, H. 1105 Walnut Street Newton Highlands, MA 02461 / US | 03 /
LOPER, James, H. 84 Stafford Holland Road Wales, MA 01081 / US | 04 /
RADFORD, Michael, T. 12 Kenmare Road Nashua, NH 03062 / US | 05 /
DEVELLIAN, Carol 64 S Main Street Topsfield, MA 01983 / US | 06 /
KAPLAN, Aaron, V. 225 Douglas Road Norwich, VT 05055 / US | 07 /
LAMPORT, Ronald B. 66 Stonepost Road Pelham, NH 03076 / US | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 17797501.8 | 26.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017US58600 | Priority number, date | US201662413632P | 27.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662413632 P | US201762459503P | 15.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762459503 P | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018081466 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3531926 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/12 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
A61B17/12122 (EP,US);
A61B17/12031 (US);
A61B17/12131 (US);
A61B17/12145 (EP,US);
A61B17/1215 (EP,US);
A61B17/12172 (EP,US);
A61B17/12177 (EP,US);
A61B17/12181 (EP,US);
A61M29/00 (US);
A61B17/00491 (EP,US);
A61B17/12036 (EP,US);
A61B17/12136 (EP,US);
A61B17/1219 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00022 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00221 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00853 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00893 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00898 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00951 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1205 (US);
A61B2017/12054 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320069 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0016 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3966 (EP,US);
A61M2205/04 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
A61N1/395 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM AUSSCHLUSS DES LINKEN HERZOHRS | [2024/26] | English: | DEVICES FOR EXCLUDING THE LEFT ATRIAL APPENDAGE | [2024/26] | French: | DISPOSITIFS POUR L'EXCLUSION DE L' AURICULE GAUCHE | [2024/26] |
Former [2019/36] | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSSCHLUSS DES LINKEN VORHOFANHANGS | ||
Former [2019/36] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR EXCLUDING THE LEFT ATRIAL APPENDAGE | ||
Former [2019/36] | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'EXCLUSION DE L'APPENDICE AURICULAIRE GAUCHE | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 15.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2021 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 02.03.2021 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.06.2024 | 05.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2005234543 (GLASER ERIK [US], et al); | [Y]US2014277074 (KAPLAN AARON V [US], et al); | [XYI]EP3085310 (COHEREX MEDICAL INC [US]) | by applicant | US7803395 | US8337487 | EP20140779640 |