EP3525773 - NEBULIZABLE COMPOSITIONS OF TIOTROPIUM AND FORMOTEROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glenmark Specialty S.A. Avenue Léopold-Robert 37 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DHUPPAD, Ulhas R. Bunglow No. B-3 Coral Apt. Resi 1-Phase Shahu Nagar Motwani Factory Road, Nashik Road Nashik 422101 / IN | 02 /
RASE, Mahadeorao Sagar In front of water supply office Narendra Nagar 444705 Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
MURUGAN, Ramprasad 10/106 - T.V.K Nagar Harur Dharmapuri Dist. 636903 / IN | 04 /
KOPPENHAGEN, Franciscus 819 SE 16th Street Deerfield Beach, Florida 33441 / US | 05 /
BERRY, Julianne 719 Castleman Drive Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 17797742.8 | 13.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017IB56371 | Priority number, date | IN201621035197 | 14.10.2016 Original published format: IN201621035197 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018069887 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3525773 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/72, A61K31/167, A61K31/439, B65D81/32, A61M15/00 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
A61K9/0078 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/46 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K47/12 (US);
A61K47/183 (US);
A61M15/0028 (US);
A61M15/0031 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/46, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON TIOTROPIUM UND FORMOTEROL | [2019/34] | English: | NEBULIZABLE COMPOSITIONS OF TIOTROPIUM AND FORMOTEROL | [2019/34] | French: | COMPOSITIONS NÉBULISABLES DE TIOTROPIUM ET DE FORMOTÉROL | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 07.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2007293460 (RAY JAY R II [US], et al) [X] 8-16,19-28,31,33-43,46-50 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * example - * * claim - * [Y] 1-7,32,51-63 [I] 17,18,29,30,44,45,52,53; | [Y]US2014224815 (GALLEM THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7,32,51-63 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0057]; figures 4-6 * * claim - *; | [A]US6433027 (BOZUNG KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-63 * column 6, line 31 - column 7, line 30 * * example - * * claim - *; | [A]WO03035030 (PARI GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-63 * page 2, line 12 - line 19 * * page 3, line 10 - line 32 * * example 6 * * claim - * | by applicant | US6537524 | USRE39820E | US6777423 |