EP3460385 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING VOLUME OF OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Hikrobot Technology Co., Ltd No. 555 Qianmo Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Wencong No. 555 Qianmo Road Binjiang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 02 /
WU, Kuang No. 555 Qianmo Road Binjiang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 03 /
JIA, Yonghua No. 555 Qianmo Road Binjiang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Opilex 32, rue Victor Lagrange 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | Guérin, Jean-Philippe Opilex 32 rue Victor Lagrange 69007 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 17798552.0 | 30.03.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017CN78768 | Priority number, date | CN201610323084 | 16.05.2016 Original published format: CN201610323084 | [2019/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017197988 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460385 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3460385 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/00, G06T7/11, G06T7/62 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
G06T7/62 (EP,US);
G01B11/00 (EP,CN,US);
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/13 (US);
G06T7/136 (US);
G06T7/55 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/13] | G01B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES VOLUMENS EINES OBJEKTES | [2019/13] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING VOLUME OF OBJECT | [2019/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTERMINATION DE VOLUME D'OBJET | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2018 | Translation filed | 29.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 07.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2017 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 30.03.2017 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN101846503 (CHINESE ACAD INST AUTOMATION) [X] 1,5-7,11-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] - [0017] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0058] * [I] 2-4,8-10; | [A]US8381976 (MOHIDEEN MOHAMMED IBRAHIM [IN], et al) [A] 2,8 * abstract * * column 1, line 59 - column 4, line 21 *; | [XI]CN104330038 (XIAMEN INTELLECISION INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1,5-7,11-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0064] - [0066] * [I] 2-4,8-10; | [A] - GREFF K ET AL, "A COMPARISON BETWEEN BACKGROUND SUBTRACTION ALGORITHMS USING A CONSUMER DEPTH CAMERA", doi:10.5220/0003849104310436, (20120224), pages 431 - 436, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION THEORY AND APPLICATIONS (VISAPP 2012); ROME, ITALY; 24 - 26 FEBRUARY, 2012, SCITEPRESS, URL: http://www2.ic.uff.br/~medialab/Andre/visapp2012.pdf, (20150729), XP002742816 [A] 3,4,9,10 * abstract * * page 434, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5220/0003849104310436 | International search | [A]CN102564338 (HONEYWELL INT INC) [A] 1-14, 16, 17 * , the whole document *; | [XY]CN103983334 (LENOVO BEIJING LTD) [X] 1, 2, 5-9, 12-14, 16, 17 * , description, paragraphs [0075]-[0091], description, paragraphs [0075]-[0091] * [Y] 3, 4, 10, 11; | [A]WO2014147863 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14, 16, 17 * , the whole document *; | [Y]CN104517095 (UNIV NANJING SCIENCE & TECH) [Y] 3, 4, 10, 11 * , description, paragraphs [0023]-[0053] *; | [A]US2015302594 (MOORE RICHARD H [US], et al) [A] 1-14, 16, 17* , the whole document *; | [A]CN204881572U (BEIJING JINGDONG SHANGKE INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-14, 16, 17 * , the whole document *; | [E]CN106839975 (HIKVISION DIGITAL TECH CO LTD) [E] 1, 2, 6, 8, 9, 13, 16 * , description, paragraphs [0033]-[0130] * |