EP3460004 - POLYARYLENE SULFIDE RESIN COMPOSITION HAVING EXCELLENT CHEMICAL RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Chemicals Co., Ltd. 310, Pangyo-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2020/11] |
Former [2019/13] | For all designated states Initz Co., Ltd. 119 Cheoyong-ro 616beon-gil Nam-gu, Ulsan 44784 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hae-ri 3 Jangmi-ro 156beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13504 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Jong-Wook 351-2002 28 Jeongjacheon-ro 188beon-gil Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16316 / KR | 03 /
AHN, Byung-woo 214-603 180 Woninjae-ro Yeonsu-gu Incheon 21931 / KR | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 17799561.0 | 31.03.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017KR03544 | Priority number, date | KR20160061468 | 19.05.2016 Original published format: KR 20160061468 | [2019/13] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017200203 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460004 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08L81/02, C08G75/0209, C08K3/34, C08K7/14, C08K3/22, C08K7/24, C08K3/26, C08K5/548 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
C08K7/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08L81/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08G75/0209 (KR,US);
C08G75/0263 (US);
C08K13/02 (US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/26 (EP,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/40 (US);
C08K5/548 (EP,KR,US);
C08K7/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08K9/12 (KR);
C08G2261/63 (KR);
C08K2003/267 (US);
C08K2201/003 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/26, C08L81/02 (EP);
C08K5/548, C08L81/02 (EP);
C08K7/14, C08L81/02 (EP);
C08K7/24, C08L81/02 (EP) |
Former IPC [2019/13] | C08L81/02, C08G75/0209, C08K3/34, C08K7/14, C08K3/22, C08K7/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | POLYARYLENSULFIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HERVORRAGENDER CHEMIKALIENBESTÄNDIGKEIT | [2019/13] | English: | POLYARYLENE SULFIDE RESIN COMPOSITION HAVING EXCELLENT CHEMICAL RESISTANCE | [2019/13] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE POLYSULFURE D'ARYLÈNE PRÉSENTANT UNE EXCELLENTE RÉSISTANCE CHIMIQUE | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2018 | Translation filed | 14.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 05.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2000080274 ; | [Y]WO2008023915 (SK CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 2,9* table 2 *; | [XYI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 25, Database accession no. 2000-286860, XP002796690 & JP2000080274 A 20000321 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,11-13 * [0038], [0074], [0085];; claims 1-15 * [Y] 2,9 [I] 5,6,10 | International search | [Y]US4529769 (JOHNSON TIMOTHY W [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * See claims 1,8; column 1, tines 8-9; column 4, lines 11-17, lines 33-37. *; | [Y]KR910009834B (CALP IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * See claim 1. *; | [A]EP0401502 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [A] 1-13* See claims 1-11. *; | [A]KR20140063834 (TICONA LLC [US]) [A] 1-13 * See claims 1-15. *; | [Y]KR20150093641 (SK CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-13 * See claims 1, 2, 5, 1 3; paragraphs [0004]-[0009]. * | by applicant | US2513188 | US2583941 |