EP3458348 - TRACK RACING BIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Felt Racing, LLC 12 Chrysler Irvine, California 92618 / US | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOUCEK, Jeffrey A. 12 Chrysler Irvine, California 92618 / US | 02 /
PETROV, Anton A. 12 Chrysler Irvine, California 92618 / US | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Pallini Gervasi, Diego, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | Pallini Gervasi, Diego, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 17799985.1 | 16.05.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017US32837 | Priority number, date | US201662338293P | 18.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662338293 P | US201715595321 | 15.05.2017 Original published format: US201715595321 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017200999 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3458348 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B62K19/02, B62K3/02, B62K3/04, B62K19/00, B62K19/12, B62K19/30, B62K19/44 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
B62J13/00 (EP,US);
B62J13/02 (US);
B62J13/04 (US);
B62J17/00 (EP,US);
B62K19/02 (EP,US);
B62K19/30 (EP,US);
B62M1/10 (US);
B62M1/36 (US);
B62K21/125 (EP,US);
B62M1/38 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | BAHNRAD | [2019/13] | English: | TRACK RACING BIKE | [2019/13] | French: | VÉLO DE COURSE SUR PISTE | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 03.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 15.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2010225090 (CUSACK DOUGLAS A [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * entire document *; | [XY]US2008238026 (CALLAHAN JEAN-LUC [US], et al) [X] 12, 13, 15 * entire document * [Y] 14, 16, 17; | [Y]US2016096588 (ROMEO LLOYD OAKLEY [US]) [Y] 6-11 * entire document *; | [Y]US504121 (CHEESMAN) [Y] 6-11 * entire document *; | [Y]US2010289246 (WILLIAMS MARTY [US]) [Y] 14 * entire document *; | [Y]US5567020 (PHILLIPS CAL M [US], et al) [Y] 16 * entire document *; | [Y]US5211415 (GASIOROWSKI ROMAN J [US]) [Y] 17 * entire document *; | [A]US4513986 (TRIMBLE JAMES L [US]) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [A]US2008252039 (LANE TIMOTHY SAUL [US]) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [A]US2010253039 (BUCKENBERGER DAVID TYSON [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * entire document * |