EP3528948 - MICROFLUIDIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menarini Silicon Biosystems S.p.A. Via G. di Vittorio, 21 B/3 40013 Castel Maggiore (BO) / IT | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEDORO, Gianni Via della Badia 9 40033 Casalecchio Di Reno / IT | 02 /
CALANCA, Alex Via Statale Nord 134 41037 Mirandola / IT | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Mangini, Simone, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 17800613.6 | 18.10.2017 | [2019/35] | WO2017IB56473 | Priority number, date | IT20160104601 | 18.10.2016 Original published format: IT201600104601 | [2019/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018073760 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3528948 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3528948 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
B01L3/502761 (EP,IL,KR);
B01L3/502707 (IL,US);
B01L3/502715 (KR);
B01L3/50273 (IL,US);
B01L7/00 (IL,US);
B01L2200/0652 (EP,IL,KR);
B01L2300/047 (IL,US);
B01L2300/06 (KR);
B01L2300/0627 (IL,US);
B01L2300/0645 (IL,KR,US);
B01L2300/0663 (EP,IL);
B01L2300/0809 (IL,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,IL,KR);
B01L2300/0861 (KR);
B01L2300/0883 (IL,US);
B01L2300/1822 (EP,IL,KR,US);
B01L2300/185 (EP,IL,KR);
B01L2300/1894 (EP,IL,KR);
B01L2400/0415 (IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | 15.04.2019 | ME | 15.04.2019 | Validation states | MA | 15.04.2019 | MD | 15.04.2019 | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHES SYSTEM | [2019/35] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC SYSTEM | [2019/35] | French: | SYSTÈME MICROFLUIDIQUE | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 15.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | MK | 22.07.2020 | MT | 22.07.2020 | RS | 22.07.2020 | SK | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | NO | 22.10.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MT | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 22.07.2020 | |
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | HR | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 22.07.2020 | |
NO | 22.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US7485454 (JURY ANDREY ZARUR [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 3, line 53 - line 56 * * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, lines 29-31, 53-60 * * column 6, line 18 - line 35 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 8 * * column 7, line 20 - line 22 * * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 27 * * column 8, line 34 - line 36 * * figures 1, 1A, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 *; | [A]US2009269767 (SODERLUND HANS [FI], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [XI]US2012184010 (MEDORO GIANNI [IT], et al) [X] 1,9-13,17-20 * paragraphs [0026] , [0051] - [0055] - [0062] - [0065] - [0070] , [0096] , [0101] , [0121] , [0125] - paragraphs [0129] , [0139] , [0143] , [0197] , [0198] , [0225] , [0234] , [0242] , [0270] , [0311] * * figures 1, 3, 4, 5, 10-13, 21 * [I] 2-8,14-16 |