EP3532091 - ANTI-MIC ANTIBIDIES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOMBANA, Twyla, Noelle c/o Genetech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
SPIESS, Christoph c/o Genetech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
KIM, Jeong c/o Genetech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 04 /
TOY, Evangeline c/o Genetech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 05 /
YE, Zhengmao c/o Genetech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 06 /
BEVERS, III, Jack c/o Genetech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 07 /
SCHARTNER, Jill c/o Genetech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 08 /
COOK, Ryan c/o Genetech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 09 /
MATSUMOTO, Marissa c/o Genetech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 10 /
BERKLEY, Amy c/o Genetech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Brodbeck, Michel F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 17801172.2 | 27.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017US58880 | Priority number, date | US201662414670P | 29.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662414670 P | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018081648 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3532091 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K16/00, C07K16/08, C07K16/28 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
C07K16/2833 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07K16/08 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/41 (US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/567 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Title | German: | ANTI-MIC-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2019/36] | English: | ANTI-MIC ANTIBIDIES AND METHODS OF USE | [2019/36] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-MIC ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 10.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/12] | 17.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/12] | Divisional application(s) | EP21200503.7 | Request for further processing for: | 19.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2013117647 (INNATE PHARMA [FR]); | [XI]WO2014144791 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]); | [XI]WO2014140904 (NOVELOGICS BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [CA]); | [XI]WO2015085210 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]); | [XI]WO2016154585 (SENTMAN CHARLES [US], et al); | [T]WO2017157895 (INNATE PHARMA [FR]); | by applicant | US4676980 | US4737456 | US4816567 | US4943533 | EP0404097 | WO9301161 | US5208020 | WO9308829 | US5212290 | WO9316185 | WO9411026 | WO9429351 | US5416064 | EP0659439 | US5457105 | US5475001 | WO9603397 | US5500362 | EP0425235 | WO9630347 | WO9633978 | WO9633980 | US5571894 | WO9640210 | US5587458 | US5616582 | US5624821 | US5635483 | US5648260 | US5648237 | US5654307 | WO9730087 | US5679683 | WO9738983 | US5712374 | US5714586 | US5731168 | WO9814451 | US5739116 | US5747498 | US5750373 | US5760041 | US5767285 | US5770599 | US5770429 | US5770701 | US5770710 | US5773001 | US5780588 | US5789199 | US5804396 | WO9843960 | US5821337 | WO9850433 | WO9850038 | US5840523 | WO9858964 | US5866572 | US5869046 | WO9906378 | WO9906396 | WO9909016 | US5877296 | US5891996 | WO9922764 | WO9924037 | US5959177 | WO9951642 | US6002008 | US6040498 | US6075181 | US6084095 | WO0061739 | US6140332 | US6150584 | US6171586 | US6194551 | WO0129246 | US6235883 | US6248516 | US6265410 | US6267958 | US6344459 | US6344455 | WO0231140 | US6391874 | US6399602 | US6417429 | US6420548 | US6455534 | US2002164328 | WO03011878 | US6521620 | US2003115614 | US6596726 | US6602863 | US6602684 | US2003157108 | US6630579 | WO03085119 | WO03084570 | WO03085107 | US6713484 | US2004093621 | US6737056 | US2004110704 | US2004110282 | US2004109865 | US2004132140 | WO2004056312 | US2005014934 | US2005079574 | WO2005035586 | WO2005035778 | US2005119455 | US2005123546 | WO2005053742 | WO2005100402 | US2005260186 | US2005266000 | US6982321 | US2006025576 | WO2006029879 | WO2006044908 | US7041870 | US2006104968 | US7087409 | US7125978 | WO2006121168 | WO2007005874 | US7189826 | US2007061900 | US2007117126 | US2007160598 | US2007237764 | US2007292936 | US7332581 | US2008069820 | US7371826 | WO2008077546 | US2009002360 | US7498298 | US7521541 | US7527791 | WO2009089004 | WO2009101611 | WO2009114335 | WO2010005958 | WO2010027827 | WO2010077634 | WO2011066342 | WO2013117647 | WO2015085210 |