EP3549097 - METHOD OF ANALYZING A LIGHT DISTRIBUTION OF A VEHICLE HEADLIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumileds Holding B.V. The Base, Tower B5 unit 107 Evert van de Beekstraat 1 1118 CL Schiphol / NL | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBERLEIN, Yul, Jens c/o Lumileds Germany GmbH Intellectual Property - Philipsstr. 8 52068 Aachen / DE | 02 /
HEITHOFF, Maximilian c/o Lumileds Germany GmbH Intellectual Property - Philipsstr. 8 52068 Aachen / DE | 03 /
KUEPPER, Lukas c/o Lumileds Germany GmbH Intellectual Property - Philipsstr. 8 52068 Aachen / DE | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | ter Heegde, Paul Gerard Michel Lumileds Germany GmbH Philipsstraße 8 52068 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/41] | Rüber, Bernhard Jakob Lumileds Germany GmbH Intellectual Property Philipsstraße 8 52068 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 17801736.4 | 27.11.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017EP80501 | Priority number, date | EP20160201740 | 01.12.2016 Original published format: EP 16201740 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018099852 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3549097 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G01M11/06 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
G06T7/0004 (EP);
G01M11/064 (US);
B60Q1/045 (US);
G01M11/065 (EP);
G06T2207/10024 (EP);
G06T2207/20076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE EINER LICHTVERTEILUNG EINES FAHRZEUGSCHEINWERFERS | [2019/41] | English: | METHOD OF ANALYZING A LIGHT DISTRIBUTION OF A VEHICLE HEADLIGHT | [2019/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE D'UNE DISTRIBUTION DE LUMIÈRE D'UN PHARE DE VÉHICULE | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 01.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.11.2021 | 11.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/14] | 29.11.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5896085 (MORI TAKAKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [A]US8422004 (EKLADYOUS ALBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1,8 * * the whole document *; | [A]DE102012209927 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]) [A] 8 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] *; | [XI] - Henning Kiel, "Bewertung von Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfern mit Lichtsimulation", (20120511), pages 1 - 199, URL: http://d-nb.info/1024884686/34, (20170523), XP055375285 [X] 1-7,10-12,14 * page 54 - page 59 * * page 41 - page 44 * * sections 4 and 5 * * equation (5.2) * * figures 3.3, 3.4, 3.10, 3.15, 4.2, 5.3, 5.4 * * page 37 * [I] 8,13 | [A] - TOMASZ TARGOSINSKI, "IMPORTANCE OF CUT-OFF LINE IN AUTOMOTIVE HEADLAMPS AIMING", JOURNAL OF KONES INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES, (20120101), vol. 19, no. 3, doi:10.5604/12314005.1138161, ISSN 1231-4005, pages 469 - 476, XP055375252 [A] 1-14 * page 469 - page 470 * * abstract * * figures 1-3, 5-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5604/12314005.1138161 | [A] - MICHAEL SIVAK ET AL, "Visual Aiming of European and U.S. Low-Beam Headlamps", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, US, (19920224), vol. 1, doi:10.4271/920814, ISSN 0148-7191, XP055375948 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * equations (1)-(4); page 2 * * figures 8-19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4271/920814 | [A] - JOE J. LONES ET AL, "Practical measure of headlamp beam alignment in vehicle assembly", SPIE - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING. PROCEEDINGS, US, (20060831), vol. 6288, doi:10.1117/12.682829, ISSN 0277-786X, ISBN 978-1-5106-0753-8, page 62880F, XP055375137 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * * figures 7-10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.682829 | by applicant | - "Tomasz Targosinski: Importance of Cut-Off Line in Automotive Headlamps Aiming", Journal of KONES Powertrain and Transport, (20120000), vol. 19, no. 3 | - SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, (19920224), vol. 1, ISSN 0148-7191 | - ECE R112, (20130109), pages 14 - 21 |